County of Tulare, California v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-45997
District Judge Dan Aaron Polster, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 14, 2019 at 7:43 PM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo County of Tulare, California, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus Anderson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennie Lee Anderson +1 415 896 1000 +1 415 896 2249 jennie@andrusanderson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Casey, Gerry, Schenk, Francavilla, Blatt & Penfield LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gayle M Blatt +1 619 238 1811 +1 619 544 9232 gmb@cglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David S Casey, JR +1 619 238 1811 +1 619 544 9232 dcasey@cglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alyssa M Williams +1 619 238 1811 +1 619 544 9232 awilliams@cglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aelish Marie Baig +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 AelishB@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanford Heisler Sharp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward D. Chapin +1 619 577 4253 +1 619 577 4250 echapin2@sanfordheisler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louise Hornbeck Renne +1 415 678 3810 +4 155 678 3838 lrenne@publiclawgroup.com
v.
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo International plc, Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Tulare, California. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018 filed on behalf of County of Tulare, California (Baig, Aelish) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Tulare, California. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018 filed on behalf of County of Tulare, California (Baig, Aelish) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Tulare, California. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018 filed on behalf of County of Tulare, California (Baig, Aelish) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Tulare, California. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018 filed on behalf of County of Tulare, California (Baig, Aelish) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Tulare, California. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018 filed on behalf of County of Tulare, California (Baig, Aelish) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Eastern. Case number 1:18-cv-00860. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Transfer Case (District)
                CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-50). CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio. MDL No. 2804. (Robles, S) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennie Lee Anderson on behalf of County of Tulare, California. (Anderson, Jennie) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alyssa Marie Williams on behalf of County of Tulare, California. Attorney Williams, Alyssa Marie added. (Williams, Alyssa) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennie Lee Anderson on behalf of County of Tulare, California. Attorney Anderson, Jennie Lee added. (Anderson, Jennie) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gayle Meryl Blatt on behalf of County of Tulare, California. Attorney Blatt, Gayle Meryl added. (Blatt, Gayle) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Louise Hornbeck Renne on behalf of County of Tulare, California. Attorney Renne, Louise Hornbeck added. (Renne, Louise) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Seabold Casey, Jr., Jr on behalf of County of Tulare, California. Attorney Casey, Jr., David Seabold added. (Casey, Jr., David) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Edward D. Chapin on behalf of County of Tulare, California. Attorney Chapin, Edward D. added. (Chapin, Edward) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Hellings, J) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to *McKesson Corporation, Purde Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Aelish Marie Baig* *Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP* *One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800, Post Montgomery Center* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Hellings, J) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Aelish Marie Baig* *Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP* *One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800, Post Montgomery Center* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Hellings, J) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to *AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Aelish Marie Baig* *Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP* *One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800, Post Montgomery Center* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Hellings, J) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT against AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purde Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by County of Tulare, California. Attorney Baig, Aelish Marie added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7728983) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from caed on 8/22/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?