(PS)Willis v. Citi Residential Lending
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:08-cv-00712-AG-AN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 5:14 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 00 U.S.C. § 0000
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/8/2008 ORDERING 13 Motion to dismiss or transfer is DROPPED from this court's 5/16/2008, law and motion calendar; GRANTING 13 Ameriquest Mortgage Co. Motion to Transfer. This action is tran sferred to the USDC Central District of California (Southern Division); and the Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. (cc: electronic case file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent to USDC CDCA So. Div.). CASE CLOSED (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/26/2008.]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/14/07 GRANTING IFP Application. Clerk to issue process and sent to plaintiff 1 instruction sheet, a USM-285 form and a summons for each defendant, and a copy of plaintiff's 12/13/07 complaint. (Dillon, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/26/2008.]
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?