United States v. 7301 Poudre Canyon, Bellvue, Colorado
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00257-MSK-MJW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 23, 2018 at 10:20 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE: granting 46 Unopposed Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture. A Certificate of Reasonable Cause pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2465, which this Order constitutes, is granted as to defendant 7301 Poudre Canyon, Bellvue, Colorado. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/30/08.(jmp, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER re: 34 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by USA. The Scheduling/Planning Conference is VACATED. Status Report due by 5/2/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/11/08. (jmp, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/22/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/28/08. (jmp, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 22 MOTION to Stay OR continue civil forfeiture proceedings by Interested Party John Eric Wing. Case STAYED as to John Eric Wing, only to 09/28/2007. Mr. Wing's answer will be filed on 09/28/2007 or within 20 days after the state case is concluded. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/18/07.(dln, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER denying without prejudice 11 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/24/07.(dln, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?