J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Barajas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00837-JAD-NJK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 23, 2018 at 2:03 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER. The parties failed to appear at a hearing scheduled for 12/09/2015 at 3:30 p.m. The Court hereby ADMONISHES Plaintiff's counsel Richard Gunnerson and Defendant Timoteo Barajas that they must comply with all court orders and all applicable rules in the future. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/11/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER. The Court hereby SETS a scheduling conference on 12/09/2015 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe regarding 20 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Prior to the hearing, Plaintiff's counsel and Mr. Ba rajas shall familiarize themselves with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1.In addition, Mr. Barajas appears to be attempting to represented Defendant Timos, Inc. in this matter. Mr. Barajas i s advised that corporations may appear in federal court only through a licensed attorney. Mr. Barajas shall immediately attempt to obtain an attorney to appear on behalf of Defendant Timos,Inc., and shall be prepared to discuss the status of that process at the above hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/03/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff and Defendant Timoteo Barajas to file a joint proposed discovery plan no later than 12/03/2015. Failure to comply with this order will result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 11/10/2015. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/04/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER re 13 Order. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff and Defendant Timoteo Barajas to file the joint status report previously ordered no later than October 22, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?