DAVIS v. SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00009
District Judge MARK E WALKER, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge MARK E WALKER
Last Updated October 22, 2018 at 5:06 AM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo EDWARD DAVIS, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr. +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 mburton@audetlaw.com

Represented by BRODSKY FOTIU-WOJTOWICZ PLLC - MIAMI FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Henry Brodsky +1 305 677 5088 +1 305 677 5089 bbrodsky@bfwlegal.com
Space ALAINA FOTIU-WOJTOWICZ +1 305 503 5054 +1 305 677 5089 alaina@bfwlegal.com

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com

Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/24/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT SHAYNA E. SACKS ssacks@napolilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/24/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK +1 212 397 1000 +1 646 843 7603 hunter@napolilaw.com

Represented by pacifictrialattorneys.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SCOTT JASON FERRELL +1 949 706 6464 +1 949 706 6469 eserve@pacifictrialattorneys.com
v.
No Logo SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Timeline
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
UNOPPOSED MOTION for An Extension of Time to File A Response To Plaintiff's Complaint by SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (kdm) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by EDWARD DAVIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Florida Central Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Law) (BRODSKY, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER GRANTING 4 ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. (Appointed SCOTT JASON FERRELL for EDWARD DAVIS). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/2/2018. (kdm) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott J. Ferrell.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4087635.) by EDWARD DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing) (BRODSKY, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Sunstate Federal Credit Union. (kdm) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Sunstate Federal Credit Union ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4068477.), filed by Edward Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (BRODSKY, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 18 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?