Marradi v. Woody's Pizza, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-10001
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 24, 2018 at 3:33 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Raoul Marradi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Edward N. Garno +1 978 687 7805 +1 978 688 8892 nedgarno@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Todd W. Shulby, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Todd William Shulby +1 954 530 2236 +1 954 530 6628 tshulby@shulbylaw.com
v.
No Logo John G. Wood, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ethan A. Park +1 617 875 8146 epark.esq@gmail.com
No Logo Woody's Pizza, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ethan A. Park +1 617 875 8146 epark.esq@gmail.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1218(2)
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court having been advised on August 27, 2018 that the above-entitled action has been settled; IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right of any party, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action within thirty (30) days if settlement is not consummated. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Settlement by Raoul Marradi (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING AND INSTRUCTION ORDER. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. 6/20/18 Scheduling Conference is cancelled. The court will adopt the joint proposed schedule. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell added. Judge William G. Young no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Raoul Marradi, John G. Wood, Woody's Pizza, Inc... (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Raoul Marradi.. (Shulby, Todd) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/14/2018) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woody's Pizza, Inc.. (Park, Ethan) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER to Complaint by Woody's Pizza, Inc..(Park, Ethan) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan A. Park on behalf of Woody's Pizza, Inc. (Park, Ethan) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to Complaint by John G. Wood.(Park, Ethan) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan A. Park on behalf of John G. Wood (Park, Ethan) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed John G. Wood served on 5/1/2018, answer due 5/22/2018. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 2, 2018 to Perfect Service Upon Defendant John G. Wood. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to May 2, 2018 to Perfect Service Upon Defendant John G. Wood by Raoul Marradi.(Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed John G. Wood served on 1/18/2018, answer due 2/8/2018. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Woody's Pizza, Inc. served on 1/18/2018, answer due 2/8/2018. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Todd W. Shulby. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd W. Shulby, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6959749 by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 FL Bar Letter of Good Standing)(Garno, Edward) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Summons Issued as to John G. Wood, Woody's Pizza, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                COMPLAINT against John G. Wood, Woody's Pizza, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6946229 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Garno, Edward) (Entered: 01/01/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?