Finitz v. O'Rourke
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-09640-JPC
District Judge John P. Cronan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 28, 2021 at 5:44 PM DT (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Finitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bragar, Eagel Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MELISSA ANN FORTUNATO +1 203 788 3165 fortunato@bespc.com
No Logo Kyle Irvine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bragar, Eagel Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MELISSA ANN FORTUNATO +1 203 788 3165 fortunato@bespc.com
No Logo Todd Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bragar, Eagel Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MELISSA ANN FORTUNATO +1 203 788 3165 fortunato@bespc.com
v.
No Logo Andrew J. Kaplan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas H. Flaum +1 212 813 8800 dflaum@goodwinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Scott Carlton +1 213 683 6113 +1 213 627 0705 scottcarlton@paulhastings.com
Space Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 213 683 6000 thomaszaccaro@paulhastings.com
No Logo Honig, Barry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barry Honig"
Unknown Role, Cody Resources, Inc.
Unknown Role, Excel Global, Inc.
Unknown Role, Passport Potash Inc
Unknown Role, Smd Group Inc
Unknown Role, Aspenbio, Inc.
Unknown Role, Scorpio Mining Corp
No Logo Eric So, Defendant
No Logo Jason Les, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas H. Flaum +1 212 813 8800 dflaum@goodwinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Scott Carlton +1 213 683 6113 +1 213 627 0705 scottcarlton@paulhastings.com
Space Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 213 683 6000 thomaszaccaro@paulhastings.com
No Logo McGonegal, Jeffrey G., Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeffrey G. McGonegal"
Unknown Role, Aspenbio, Inc.
Unknown Role, Smart Move, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas H. Flaum +1 212 813 8800 dflaum@goodwinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Scott Carlton +1 213 683 6113 +1 213 627 0705 scottcarlton@paulhastings.com
Space Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 213 683 6000 thomaszaccaro@paulhastings.com
No Logo O'Rourke, III, John R., Defendant
Officially listed as "John R. O'Rourke"
Unknown Role, Aspenbio, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas H. Flaum +1 212 813 8800 dflaum@goodwinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Scott Carlton +1 213 683 6113 +1 213 627 0705 scottcarlton@paulhastings.com
Space Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 213 683 6000 thomaszaccaro@paulhastings.com
No Logo Michael M. Beeghley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas H. Flaum +1 212 813 8800 dflaum@goodwinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Scott Carlton +1 213 683 6113 +1 213 627 0705 scottcarlton@paulhastings.com
Space Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 213 683 6000 thomaszaccaro@paulhastings.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)ss
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/19/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Niagara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags STAYED,ECF
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 letterCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Melissa A. Fortunato dated 01/28/2021 re: Status Report. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith..(Fortunato, Melissa)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case shall remain stayed pending the resolution of the motion to file a consolidated second amended complaint in Takata v. Riot Blockchain, Inc., et al, 3:18-cv-02293-FLW-TJB, filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey. Within two weeks of the resolution of the motion to amend, the parties shall meet and confer and shall submit a letter to the Court regarding next steps in this litigation, including whether a further extension of the stay is preferable or necessary. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint update letter apprising the Court on the status of Takata every ninety days, with the first letter due on February 1, 2021. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/9/2020) (nb)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 letterCourt Filing
      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Melissa A. Fortunato dated 10/22/2020 re: Status Report. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith..(Fortunato, Melissa)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 Notice of change of address
        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Melissa Ann Fortunato on behalf of Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. New Address: Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C., 810 Seventh Avenue, Suite 620, New York, NY, United States 10019, 2123085858..(Fortunato, Melissa)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before this Court is adjourned pending further order of this Court. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.go /hon-john-p-cronan. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John Peter Cronan on 10/7/2020) (kv)
            LREF
            Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Paul A. Engelmayer is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
              ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [26] Motion for Thomas Anthony Zaccaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/28/2019) (anc)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [26] MOTION for Thomas Anthony Zaccaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019, Terminated: 1/28/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                  MOTION for Thomas Anthony Zaccaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael M. Beeghley, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Thomas A. Zaccaro, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Zaccaro, Thomas)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [25] MOTION for Thomas Anthony Zaccaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16207693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019, Terminated: 1/18/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas Anthony Zaccaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16207693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael M. Beeghley, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Thomas A. Zaccaro, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Zaccaro, Thomas) Modified on 1/18/2019 (wb).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [23] Motion for Daniel Scott Carlton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/7/2019) (anc)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [23] MOTION for Daniel Scott Carlton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16092495. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018, Terminated: 1/7/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                              MOTION for Daniel Scott Carlton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16092495. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael M. Beeghley, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Daniel Scott Carlton in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Carlton, D. Scott)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas H. Flaum on behalf of Michael M. Beeghley, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (Flaum, Douglas)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STAY OF PLAINTIFFS' VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that: Riot Blockchain and Defendants need not respond to the complaint filed in the Shareholder Derivative Action. The Shareholder Derivative Action, including all deadlines, hearings, and scheduling orders under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16 and 26, is temporarily stayed pending the resolution of the motion(s) to dismiss in the Securities Actions. Following resolution of the motion(s) to dismiss in the Securities Action, the Parties will meet and confer about next steps in this litigation, including whether a further extension of the stay is preferable or necessary or to agree on a briefing schedule for any motion(s) to dismiss the Shareholder Derivative Action; and as further set forth herein. For the reasons set forth above, the above stipulation having been considered and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/29/2018) (anc)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE [22] Notice) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas H. Flaum on behalf of Michael M. Beeghley, Barry Honig, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (Flaum, Douglas) Modified on 12/18/2018 (db).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                      PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michael M. Beeghley, Barry Honig, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (Flaum, Douglas)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Case Stayed
                                        Case Stayed. (anc)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Summons issued
                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (dnh)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Summons issued
                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric So. (dnh)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Summons issued
                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John R. O'Rourke. (dnh)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Summons issued
                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey G. McGonegal. (dnh)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Summons issued
                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Les. (dnh)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Summons issued
                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew J. Kaplan. (dnh)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Summons issued
                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barry Honig. (dnh)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Summons issued
                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael M. Beeghley. (dnh)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Riot Blockchain, Inc., re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric So, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John O'Rourke, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey McGonegal, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Les, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Kaplan, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barry Honig, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Beeghley, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against Michael M Beeghley, Barry Honig, Andrew J Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G McGonegal, John R O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc., Eric So. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15785288)Document filed by Todd Smith, Kyle Irvine, Christopher Finitz.(Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Melissa Ann Fortunato. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christopher Finitz, Kyle Irvine, Todd Smith, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Melissa Ann Fortunato. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:78j(b)ss; County code New York. The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to Niagara. (pne)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                    Case Designated ECF. (pne)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                        CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading
                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Melissa Ann Fortunato to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 10/29/2018. (pne)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Melissa Ann Fortunato to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 10/29/2018. (pne)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?