Holloway v. Omaha Work Staffing
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-00497

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 15, 2021 at 2:31 PM DT (5.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Supplement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Pro Se
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Supplement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Supplement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Supplement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Supplement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER - that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. ยง 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Order - Pro Se GO 2016-02
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Pro Se
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?