Peete v. House of Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01679

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2019 at 12:40 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit Habeas Corpus (General)
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order
      ORDER - Peete is ordered to show cause as to why he has not paid the filing fee or submitted a request for leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee and a certified trust account statement. Peetes filing fee, request to proceed without prepayment of the fee, or his explanation of his failure to payis due within 21 days. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the petition. (cc: all counsel and Jared Peete via US Mail)(Griesbach, William)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Mail returned
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 1 time.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?