Phillips v. Tate
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04009

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 5, 2020 at 3:58 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bennie Charles Phillips, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bennie Charles Phillips
v.
No Logo Joe Corley Detention Facility, Defendant
No Logo United States Marshal Service, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Final
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Appointment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Response
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Dismissal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Supplement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Service of Process
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                                                          NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (nortiz, 5)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (nortiz, 5) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Bennie Charles Phillips, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2018. (nortiz, 5) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, Randy Tate filed by Bennie Charles Phillips.(nortiz, 5) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?