Sellan-Mazzini v. Antunez
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-02297
District Judge Thomas J. Whelan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 23, 2018 at 11:22 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jonathan D. Montag

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jonathan David Montag +1 619 230 1420 +1 619 230 1427 jdmontag@montaglaw.com
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Alberto Gonzales

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alberto Gonzales

Toggle Switch Represented by Alexander Kenneth Haas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Alexander Kenneth Haas

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Joseph Coppolino

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Anthony Joseph Coppolino

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , E. Fletcher Jackson +1 501 225 8858

Toggle Switch Represented by James R. Whitman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , James R. Whitman

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Allen F Loucks +1 410 209 4812 +1 410 962 2310 allen.loucks@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , James Edward Cox, Jr. +1 202 305 8629 +1 503 727 1117 jim.cox2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Steven P. Croley +1 313 226 9180 +1 313 226 3271 steven.croley@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Raven M Norris +1 619 557 7157 +1 415 436 6570 raven.norris@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of United States Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Melaine A. Williams +1 404 581 6063 melaine.williams@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Law Offices, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan M. Shapiro +1 860 347 3325 +1 860 347 3874 jshapiro@shapirolawofficesct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Kenneth C. Bauman +1 503 727 1025 +1 503 727 1117 ken.bauman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Britannia I. Hobbs +1 503 727 1158 +1 503 727 1117 britannia.hobbs@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrea L. Taylor +1 913 551 6541 andrea.taylor@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , William George Pharo +1 303 454 0108 +1 303 454 0404 william.pharo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Susan Begesse Prose +1 303 454 0100 +1 303 454 0408 susan.prose@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, , Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Charmaine Michele Aarons Holder +1 713 567 9000 +1 713 718 3303 charmaine.holder@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US Departmetn of Justice, Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Leslie McKay +1 202 353 4424
No Logo Nora Antunez, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, , Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Michael A Brush +1 310 203 8818 +1 310 203 8828 michaelabrush@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , E. Fletcher Jackson +1 501 225 8858

Toggle Switch Represented by Ben Franklin Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Vesper Mei +1 202 514 4686 +1 202 616 8470 vesper.mei@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov
, , , Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division U.s. Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2017, TERMINATED: 06/13/2017, TERMINATED: 06/13/2017, TERMINATED: 06/13/2017 Victor M. Lawrence +1 202 305 8788 +1 202 233 0397 victor.lawrence@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Chertoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Chertoff

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Maura Murphy-Osborne +1 860 808 5020 +1 860 808 5347 maura.murphyosborne@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Michael D. Anderson +1 251 441 5845 mike.d.anderson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , James Edward Cox, Jr. +1 202 305 8629 +1 503 727 1117 jim.cox2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , CARLOS A. GONZALEZ +1 702 388 6336 +1 702 388 6787 carlos.gonzalez2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Raven M Norris +1 619 557 7157 +1 415 436 6570 raven.norris@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of United States Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Melaine A. Williams +1 404 581 6063 melaine.williams@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 878

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/22/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Greenstein

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth Wolstein +1 212 344 5400 +1 212 344 7677 ewolstein@schlamstone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Victoria S Shin +1 212 735 3732 +1 203 773 5373 Victoria.Shin@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-HFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Lisa E. Perkins +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 760 7979 lisa.perkins@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Kenneth C. Bauman +1 503 727 1025 +1 503 727 1117 ken.bauman@usdoj.gov
, , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kyle Scott Cohen +1 239 461 2200 Kyle.Cohen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Ira A Daves, III +1 213 894 2443 +1 213 894 7819 Ira.Daves@usdoj.gov
, , , Ila Casy Deiss +1 415 436 7124 +1 415 436 7169 ila.deiss@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , J. Michael Diaz +1 206 553 4358 michael.diaz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lara K. Eshkenazi +1 212 637 2758 +1 212 637 2730 Lara.Eshkenazi@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Britannia I. Hobbs +1 503 727 1158 +1 503 727 1117 britannia.hobbs@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Aaron Kollitz +1 213 894 2083 +1 213 894 7819 aaron.kollitz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Lisa Luis +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 lisa.luis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Melanie Lea Proctor +1 415 436 6730 +1 415 436 7169 Melanie.Proctor@usdoj.gov
, Michael Thomas Pyle +1 408 535 5087 +1 408 535 5081 michael.t.pyle@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Carlos Javier Raurell +1 305 961 9243 +1 305 530 7139 carlos.raurell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , John F. Rudy, III +1 813 274 6180 +1 813 301 3103 John.Rudy@usdoj.gov
, , , Elliot M. Schachner +1 718 254 6053 +1 718 254 6081 Elliot.Schachner@usdoj.gov
, , Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Deborah E Yim +1 213 894 2447 +1 213 894 7819 deborah.yim@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Charmaine Michele Aarons Holder +1 713 567 9000 +1 713 718 3303 charmaine.holder@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Vincent Bober +1 212 637 2718 +1 212 637 2786 david.bober@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Shane Patrick Cargo +1 212 210 9460 +1 212 922 3860 shane.cargo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brandon H. Cowart +1 212 637 2800 +1 212 637 2702 brandon.cowart@usdoj.gov
, , , , Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kristin Lynn Vassallo +1 212 637 2822 +1 212 637 2730 kristin.vassallo@usdoj.gov
, , , , Robert William Yalen +1 212 637 2722 +1 212 637 2687 robert.yalen@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/07/2015, TERMINATED: 01/07/2015, TERMINATED: 01/07/2015, TERMINATED: 01/07/2015 Jennifer A. Bowen +1 202 616 3558 +1 202 305 7000 jennifer.bowen@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , Thomas H. Dupree, Jr. +1 202 353 8679 +1 202 616 8460 thomas.dupree@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sheri R Glaser +1 202 616 1231 +1 202 616 8962 sheri.glaser@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jesse Z. Grauman +1 202 514 2849 +1 202 305 8517 jesse.z.grauman@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/03/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/03/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/03/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Zoe Heller +1 202 305 7057 zoe.heller@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Lyle D. Jentzer +1 202 305 0192 +1 202 305 0192 lyle.jentzer@usdoj.gov
, , , , Melanie S. Keiper +1 202 532 4112 melanie.keiper@usdoj.gov
, , , Deitz Patrick Lefort +1 202 305 1048 deitz.lefort@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa S Leibman +1 202 305 7016 +1 202 305 7000 Melissa.Leibman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Brant S. Levine +1 202 616 4373 +1 202 616 4314 Brant.Levine@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lisa Zeidner Marcus +1 202 514 3336 lisa.marcus@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , William Henry Redkey, Jr. +1 206 553 7970 +1553250 +15 553 2502 ecf-crm.usawaw@usdoj.gov
, , Robert Seder +1 206 553 7970 +1 206 553 4073 ecf-civ.usawaw@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Laura Katherine Smith +1 202 616 0419 +1 202 616 4314 laura.smith2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/16/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/16/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/16/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY P Michael Truman +1 202 616 9345
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Christopher Ward +1 202 616 9121 brian.c.ward@usdoj.gov
, , , , Gisela Ann Westwater +1 202 532 4174 gisela.westwater@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Rebecca S. Cohen +1 206 553 7970 +1 206 553 4067 rebecca.cohen@usdoj.gov
, , , , Kristin Berger Johnson +1 206 553 7970 Kristin.B.Johnson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Melissa S Leibman +1 202 305 7016 +1 202 305 7000 Melissa.Leibman@usdoj.gov
, Marion J. Mittet +1 206 553 7970 Jamie.Mittet@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US Departmetn of Justice, Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Leslie McKay +1 202 353 4424
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Respondents against Petitioner. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED on February 26, 2007 Petitioner filed a Notification Regarding Custody Status, informing the Court that Petitioner "was released from detention under an order of supervision." Because Petitioner obtained the relief sought, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed as moot. On April 20, 2007, Petitioner responded to the Order to Show Cause. Petitioner concedes that this case is now moot. Accordingly, this matter is dismissed. (aje)(bar, ). (Entered: 04/24/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER Dismissing Case as Moot; On April 20, 2007, Petitioner responded to the OSC. Petitioner concedes that this case is now moot. Accordingly, the matter is dismissed. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/23/07. (aje) (bar, ). (Entered: 04/24/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini re 10 Memorandum in Response to Notice to Show Cause (Montag, Jonathan) Modified on 4/23/2007 to update text (aje). (Entered: 04/20/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini. (Montag, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Petitioner is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed. Petitioner shall file and serve his memorandum of points and authorities no later than 5/4/2007. Respondents may file and serve a response no later than 5/11/2007. Neither party's brief shall exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/20/07. (aje)(mam). (Entered: 04/20/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini re 7 Notice (Other) of Change in Custody Status (Montag, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE by Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini of Change in Custody Status (Montag, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini re Travserse (Montag, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/30/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Traverse to Complaint Habeas Corpus Petition by Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit in support of the Traverse)(Montag, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/30/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Government's RETURN in RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Nora Antunez, Michael Chertoff, Alberto Gonzales.(Bettwy, Samuel) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER requiring return to writ of habeas corpus petition; Nora Antunez, Michael Chertoff, and Alberto Gonzales return due 12/15/2006. Traverse due by 1/16/2007. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/1/06. (mam) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini Petition and Proposed OSC (Montag, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241, filed by Adan Tony Sellan-Mazzini. (Filing fee $ 5.)(mam) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 13 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?