Rea v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-00902-FCD-DAD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 24, 2018 at 2:26 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/5/2009 ORDERING 8 Motion to Dismiss Hearing CONTINUED to 10/30/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Pltf shall file and serve its opposition brief or notice of non -opposition no later than 10/16/2009; Dft may file and serve a reply on or before 10/23/2009. Pltf is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $150 for failing to file an opposition or notice of non-opposition to dft's motion in compliance with LR 78-230(c); Pltf shall file his response to OSC on or before 10/16/2009. A hearing on the OSC, if necessary, will follow the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss. (Reader, L)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    AMENDED ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/2/2009 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporarty Restraining Order is 2 DENIED. (Krueger, M)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/2/2009 ORDERING that plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 2 is DENIED. (Krueger, M)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?