Larry Greenwood v. Scan Health Plan
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC715157

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 24, 2018 at 11:24 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Greenwood Larry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawyers For Justice Pc
v.
No Logo Scan Health Plan, Defendant

Represented by Fisher & Phillips LLP

Type Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Order
    Blank 13 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 DEFENDANT SCAN HEALTH PLAN S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF LARRY GREENWOOD S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Answer
        Blank 11 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Proof of Service of Summons
          Blank 10 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Proof Of Personal Service
          summons, complaint and Peremptory Challenge
            Blank 9 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Minute Order
              Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory
              170.6
                Blank 7 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory
                  170.6
                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 CIVIL DEPOSIT
                        Blank 3 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Notice of Case Assignment
                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Complaint
                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Complaint

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 140 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?