BROWN v. ARC COMMUNITY TRUST OF PA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-04540

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2018 at 12:21 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE BROWNS ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 8(A) AND PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CL AIM, FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. THE BROWNS ARE GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER IN THE EVENT THEY CAN STATE A BASIS FOR A PLAUSIBLE CLAIM FOR RELIEF OVER WHICH T HIS COURT HAS JURISDICTION. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND THE BROWNS A BLANK FORM COMPLAINT TO BE USED BY A NON-PRISONER FILING A CIVIL ACTION NUMBER FOR THIS CASE. THE BROWNS MAY USE THIS FORM TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. IF THE BROWNS FAIL TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 10/25/18. 10/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. (fdc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 10/25/18. 10/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. (fdc)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?