Tomi Dantan Egardo v. Healthright 360
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC719094

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 24, 2018 at 2:25 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Egardo Tomi Dantan, Plaintiff

Represented by Moon & Yang Apc

v.
No Logo Healthright 360, Defendant

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Type Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Proof-Service/Summons
    Blank 12 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Proof Of Service Summons
      Blank 11 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 CIVIL DEPOSIT
        Blank 10 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Notice
          Blank 9 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Notice NOTICE OF POSTING COMPLEX FEES
            Blank 8 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Notice
              Blank 7 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Notice NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE
                Blank 6 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Minute Order
                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Order
                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Order INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER(COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)
                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Complaint
                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Notice of Case Assignment
                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Complaint

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 236 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?