Lauren Shields v. American Honda Motor Co Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC719642

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 24, 2018 at 2:50 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Shields Lauren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Romano Mark Peter
v.
American Honda Motor Company, Inc. American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "American Honda Motor Co. Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tran Trang T.
Type Mortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Proof Of Personal Service
    Blank 11 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 AMIRICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
      Blank 10 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Answer
        Blank 9 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice of Case Management Conference
          Blank 8 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order to Show Cause Hearing
            Blank 7 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
              Blank 6 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice of Case Management Conference
                Blank 5 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Summons
                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Summons
                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Complaint
                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Notice of Case Assignment
                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Complaint

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?