Chambers v. Harris County Jail
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04033

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 14, 2018 at 1:03 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Travis Chambers, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Travis Chambers
No Logo Harris County Jail, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Memorandum on Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
        NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
            MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Travis Chambers, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (SandraSilva, 7) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Harris County Jail (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Travis Chambers.(SandraSilva, 7) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?