John-michael Finholt v. Taskrabbit Inc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC722869

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 24, 2018 at 5:04 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Finholt John-michael, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ikea Distribution Services Inc., Defendant
No Logo Taskrabbit, Inc., Defendant
Type Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice of Related Case
    Blank 10 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Proof of Service
      Blank 9 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Proof Of Service Summons
        Blank 8 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Proof Of Service Summons
          Blank 7 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Notice of Case Management Conference
            Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Notice of Case Management Conference
              Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL COMPLAINT
                Blank 4 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Notice of Case Assignment
                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Summons
                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 CIVIL DEPOSIT
                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Complaint

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?