BASQUEZ v. MESA
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2001-1-CV-680646

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 2:16 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Basquez, Salvador, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McTernan Stender & Weingus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford Stuart Weingus +1 415 777 0313 +1 415 777 9380 cweingus@mcternanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Mesa, Connie, Defendant
No Logo Mesa, Tony, Defendant
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; MCTERNAN STENDER WEINGUS & TONDREAU - S.F.; WEINGUS, CLIFF; 333 MARKET STREET SUITE 2800; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94105-2129; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
    Blank 5 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Not Active
    Case data converted on 06/28/2003; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
      Blank 4 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None other
      ..$208,931.25; AMENDED NOTICE OF RENEWAL ISSUED; (CLIFF WEINGUS); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
        Blank 3 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None other
        AMENDED APPL FOR RENEWAL OF JGT IN FAVOR OF; SALVADOR BASQUEZ AGST TONY & CONNIE MESA...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
          Blank 2 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: None Notice
          NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JGT ISSUED; (CLIFF WEINGUS); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
            Blank 1 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: None Application: Renewal Judgment
            APPL FOR RENEWAL OF JGT: SALVADOR BASQUEZ AGST; TONY & CONNIE MESA $208,931.25 (C WEINGUS); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 1 time.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?