MS. Q. v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02409

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2021 at 1:32 PM ST (4.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo J., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a minor Michael J. Galas +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520 mgalas@gibsondunn.com
a minor Abiel Garcia +1 213 229 7781 +1 213 229 6781 agarcia@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lissa M Percopo +1 202 887 3770 +1 202 530 9528 lpercopo@gibsondunn.com
a minor Katherine V.A. Smith +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520 ksmith@gibsondunn.com
a minor Wesley Sze +1 650 849 5300 +1 650 849 5333

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a minor Baher Azmy +1 212 614 6427 bazmy@ccrjustice.org
a minor J. Wells Dixon +1 212 614 6423 +1 212 614 6499 wdixon@ccrjustice.org
a minor Ghita Schwarz +1 212 614 6445 +1 212 614 6422 gschwarz@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by National Immigrant Justice Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a minor Mary Colleen Killbride +1 312 660 1417
a minor Katherine Elizabeth Mello Goettel +1 312 660 1335 kgoettel@heartlandalliance.org
No Logo MS. Q., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Michael J. Galas +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520 mgalas@gibsondunn.com
an individual Abiel Garcia +1 213 229 7781 +1 213 229 6781 agarcia@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lissa M Percopo +1 202 887 3770 +1 202 530 9528 lpercopo@gibsondunn.com
an individual Katherine V.A. Smith +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520 ksmith@gibsondunn.com
an individual Wesley Sze +1 650 849 5300 +1 650 849 5333

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Baher Azmy +1 212 614 6427 bazmy@ccrjustice.org
an individual J. Wells Dixon +1 212 614 6423 +1 212 614 6499 wdixon@ccrjustice.org
an individual Ghita Schwarz +1 212 614 6445 +1 212 614 6422 gschwarz@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by National Immigrant Justice Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Mary Colleen Killbride +1 312 660 1417
an individual Katherine Elizabeth Mello Goettel +1 312 660 1335 kgoettel@heartlandalliance.org
v.
No Logo JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity, Attorney General of the United States, U.S. Department of Justice Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in her official capacity, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo RONALD D. VITIELLO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity, Acting Director and Deputy Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION granting plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. An Order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion was issued on November 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 4, 2018. (MA)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 7 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Defendants must reunify plaintiff and her son on or before midnight on November 30, 2018; and defendants shall submit a status report on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 27, 2018. (MA)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Pro Bono Appearance by Mary Colleen Killbride on behalf of J., MS. Q. (ztd)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by J., MS. Q.. (Attachments: # 1 Koop Suppl. Decl., # 2 Ex. 5 to Koop Suppl. Decl., # 3 Ex. 6 to Koop Suppl. Decl., # 4 Fluharty Decl., # 5 Govindaiah Decl.)(Galas, Michael)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mellissa B. Harper, # 2 Exhibit A - Arrest Warrant, # 3 Exhibit B - Bond Order, # 4 Exhibit C - Removal Order, # 5 Exhibit D - Order re Class Certification Exclusions, # 6 Exhibit E - Fugitive Warrant, # 7 Exhibit F - INTERPOL Red Notice, # 8 Exhibit G - Certification of Warrant)(Sroka, Scott)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by J. Wells Dixon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dixon, J.)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR Certificate 83.2(g) by Katherine V.A. Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (zsb) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR Certificate 83.2(g) by Wesley Sze on behalf of All Plaintiffs (zsb) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO (Sroka, Scott)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR Certificate 83.2(g) by Abiel Garcia on behalf of plaintiffs J., MS. Q. (ztd) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR 83.2(g) Certificate by Ghita Schwarz on behalf of plaintiffs J., MS. Q. (ztd) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR 832(g) Certification of Indigent Representation by Michael J. Galas on behalf of J., MS. Q. (tth) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO (Sroka, Scott)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Case reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J., MS. Q. re 6 Notice of Related Case, 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA, 3 Sealed Document, 4 Complaint, 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym, 1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . (Percopo, Lissa)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J., MS. Q. re 6 Notice of Related Case, 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA, 3 Sealed Document, 4 Complaint, 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym, 1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . (Percopo, Lissa)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Baher Azmy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Azmy, Baher)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E.M. Goettel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goettel, Katherine)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by J., MS. Q. (Attachments: # 1 Ms. Q. Decl., # 2 Koop Decl., # 3 Ex. 1 to Koop Decl., # 4 Ex. 2 to Koop Decl., # 5 Ex. 3 to Koop Decl., # 6 Ex. 4 to Koop Decl., # 7 Palacios Decl., # 8 Rikkers Decl., # 9 Proposed Order)(Percopo, Lissa)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-1458. (Percopo, Lissa) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/26/2018) (ztth).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616095154) filed by MS. Q., J. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by J., MS. Q. re 1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by MS. Q., J. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (tth) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/24/2018. (tth) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Proceed Under Pseudonym
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by J., MS. Q. (Attachment: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/25/2018) (zrdj). (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2018 re 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.Oral Arguments Heard. Order Forthcoming. (Court Reporter LISA GRIFFITH.) (mac)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. The hearing on plaintiffs' motion 7 for a preliminary injunction currently scheduled for November 14, 2018 is hereby vacated and rescheduled to November 27, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 13, 2018. (MA)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/9/2018; Replies due by 11/13/2018. (tj)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' motion 18 for an extension of time to file their response to plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Defendants shall file their response on or before November 9, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, on or before November 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 7, 2018. (MA)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Opposition due by 11/6/2018, Replies due by 11/9/2018.) (tj)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' representations to the Court earlier this afternoon, defendants shall file an opposition to plaintiffs' motion 7 for a preliminary injunction on or before November 6, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file a reply on or before November 9, 2018. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion on November 14, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 30, 2018. (lcplf1)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?