FIRE INSURANCE v. FRANKE KITCHEN
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2001-1-CV-802023

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 1:04 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Fire Insurance Exchange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Franke Consumer Products, Defendant
No Logo Franke Usa, Defendant
No Logo Purcell-Murray Company Inc, Defendant
No Logo Avilion Ltd., Cross Defendant
Case Type Other Contract Unlimited (37)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 57 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; GORDON & REES LLP; TURNER, STEVEN E.; 275 BATTERY ST., 20TH FL.; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94111; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
    Blank 56 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
    ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; BRAGG & DZIESINSKI; KELLY, AMBER LEE; TWO EMBARCADERO CENTER #1400; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94111; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
      Blank 55 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
      ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; BRAGG & DZIESINSKI; KELLY, AMBER LEE; TWO EMBARCADERO CENTER #1400; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94111; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
        Blank 54 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
        ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; COLE LAW FIRM; COLE, STEPHEN N.; 2539 DEL MONTE STREET; WEST SACRAMENTO, CA 95691; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
          Blank 53 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Not Active
          Case data converted on 06/28/2003; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
            Blank 52 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None Notice
            NTC OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL & PROOF OF SERVICE; (ATTY A.KELLY); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
              Blank 51 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None Request Dismissal
              REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION; WITH/PREJUDICE COMPLT & XCOMPLT ATTY COLE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                Blank 50 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None Memorandum-At-Issue
                AT-ISSUE MEMO FILED; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                  Blank 49 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None Decision
                  NTC: CASE STATUS REVIEW; RE: PRIVATE ARBITRATION; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                    Blank 48 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                    * CMCQ FILED ON 9-30-02; BY: S. COLE, 10D1, MED; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                      Blank 47 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED; BY S. COLE, 10D1, MED; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                        Blank 46 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None Decision
                        NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDERED TO JUDICIAL ARBITRATION 8-20-02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                          Blank 45 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                          REQUEST DISMISSAL WOP OF COMPLT AS TO FRANKE; KITCHEN SYSTEM BY STEPHEN COLE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                            Blank 44 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Decision
                            NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDERED TO JUDICIAL ARBITRATION 8-20-02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                              Blank 43 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Notice
                              NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MTN TO QUASH; SVC OF SUMMS (ATTY CHECOV); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                Blank 42 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: None other
                                ...JUDGE JACOBS MAY (ATTY CHECOV); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                  Blank 41 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: None Order
                                  ORDER GRANTING X-DEFTS MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF; SUMMS & TO DISMISS X-CPLT,GRANTED BY ...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                    Blank 40 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: None Decision
                                    NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 3RD CONT. AS OF 7-23-02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                      Blank 39 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: None Declaration
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL DECL OF BRIAN P. THOMPSON IN; SUPPORT OF MTN OF X-DEFT (ATTY CHECOV)7/25/02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                        Blank 38 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: None Declaration
                                        NTC OF FILING OF ORIG SIGNED SUPPLEMENTAL DECL; OF BRIAN P. THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF MTN(CHECOV; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                          Blank 37 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                          * MEET & CONFER STATEMENT FILED 7-16-2002 (MET); BY: STEPHEN N. COLE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                            Blank 36 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                            * CMCQ FILED ON 7-16-02; BY: S. COLE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                              Blank 35 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                              * MEET & CONFER STATEMENT FILED 7-15-2002 (MET); BY: AMBER LEE KELLY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                Blank 34 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                * CMCQ FILED ON 7-15-02; BY:AMBER LEE KELLY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: None other
                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPLY, SUPPLEMENTAL DECL &; OBJECTION, BY FEDEX & 1ST CLASS MAIL; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                    OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUB BY X-CMPLT IN OPP TO; MTN TO QUASH & DISM X-CMPLT, STEVEN E. TURNER; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: None Supplemental
                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL DECL IN SUP OF MTN TO QUASH & DISM; X-CMPLT, STEVEN E. TURNER; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                        REPLY IN SUP OF MTN TO QUASH & DISM X-CMPT; STEVEN E. TURNER; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                          DECL OF THOMAS SMITH IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION; TO MTN OF AVILION LTD TO QUASH SERVICE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None Declaration
                                                            DECL OF AMBER LEE KELLY IN SUPPORT OF; OPPOSITION TO MTN TO QUASH SVC(A KELLY)7/25; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                              OPPOSITION BY PURCELL MURRAY CO. & FRANKE USA; TO MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS(A KELLY); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None other
                                                                .... TO AMBER LEE KELLY ESQ, & TO STEPEHN N; COLE ESQ ON 6/20/02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None other
                                                                  .... MEMO OF P'S & A'S; DECLS' REQ FOR JUDICIA; NTC & COMPENDIUM ON NON-CA A'S BY MAIL ....; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None other
                                                                    AMENDED CERT OF SERV ON NTC OF MTN & MTN TO; QUASH SERV OF SUMM & TO DISMISS X-COMPLT ....; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None other
                                                                      COMPENDIUM OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES CITED; IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE SUMMONS; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MTN; TO QUASH SUMMONS & DISMISS; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                          DECL. OF BRIAN P. THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF MTN; TO QUASH SUMMONS & TO DISMISS; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                            DECL. OF STEVEN E. TURNER IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO; QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS & TO DISMISS; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                              MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH; SERVICE OF SUMMONS & TO DISMISS (S E TURNER); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                NTC OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND TO; DISMISS X-COMPLAINT (HRG DATE 7/25/2 9AM D4); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                  FIRST PAPER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT 'AVILION LTD'; FOR MOTION (ATTY: STEVEN E. TURNER); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                                                                    NTC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF STEPHEN N. COLE LAW; FIRM W/PROOF OF SERVICE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None Decision
                                                                                      NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 2ND CONT AS OF 4-30-02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                        * MEET & CONFER STATEMENT FILED 4-25-2002 (MET); BY: AMBER LEE KELLY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                          * CMCQ FILED ON 4-25-2002 5EH; BY: AMBER LEE KELLY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                            * CMCQ FILED ON 4-23-02; BY:STEPHEN N.COLE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: None Decision
                                                                                              NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONT FROM 1/29/02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                * CMCQ FILED ON 1-29-02 W/M&C HAVE MET; BY:AMBER KELLY *STIP MED 5H*; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED; BY STEPHEN N COLE W/O M&C; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Registration Out of State Support Order
                                                                                                    MEET & CONFER STATEMENT/COMPLIED WITH 212(B); FILED BY STEPHEN N. COLE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: None other
                                                                                                      CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PURCELL-MURRAY & FRANKE USA; AGNST AVILION, LTD.,SMMNS ISSUED (ATTY.A.LEE); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: None Response - Other than Dissolution, 1st Paper Filing
                                                                                                        ANSWER OF PURCELL-MURRAY COMPANY, INC & FRANKE; USA TO COMPLAINT (ATTY. A. LEE); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                          NTC AND ACK OF RECEIPT AS TO FRANKE CONSUMER; PRODUCTS INC ON 11-19-01 (ATTY COLE); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None other
                                                                                                            ....SIGNED BY JUDGE JACOBS-MAY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None other
                                                                                                              AMENDMENT TO CMPLT & ORDER TO INCLUDE FRANKE; CONSUMER PRODUCTS, INC. AS PARTY DEFENDANT...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                PROOF/PERS SVC OF SUMMONS & COMPLT TO LAURENCE; PURCELL ON 10-18-01 (ATTY STEPHEN ); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED; CIVIL COVER; SHEET FILED (ATTY COLE); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?