Hall v. Cuyahoga County
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02469

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2019 at 5:33 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Eli Hall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Eli Hall
v.
No Logo Cuyahoga County, Defendant
No Logo Metro Health Hospitals, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Address Change Notice filed by Christopher Eli Hall. (W,Jo) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Inmate demand statement to 2 Affidavit of prisoner (Motion to proceed in forma pauperis) filed by Christopher Eli Hall. Related document(s) 2 . (Attachments: # 1 Letter and envelope)(H,D) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                Affidavit of Prisoner filed by Plaintiff Christopher Eli Hall. (B,R)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Complaint
                  Complaint against Cuyahoga County, Metro Health Hospitals. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Christopher Eli Hall. (Attachments: # 1 Basis for Jurisdiction, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 USM-285) (B,R)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 3 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?