Doe I v. Peterson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-00507

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 24, 2021 at 5:34 PM DT (6.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Brief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to USCA
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Reply Brief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Extend
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Index
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Index
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/29/2020, Entered: None Extend
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Extend
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Certificate
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Certificate
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Audio File
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Reply Brief
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Extend
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Index
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Filing no. 17 , the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction, is granted in part and in part held in abeyance consistent with this Order. The Defendants, and all their agents, servants, employ ees (including County Attorneys) are temporarily restrained from enforcing Neb. Rev. Stat. § 29-4003(1)(a)(iv) and Neb. Rev. Stat. § 29-4003 (1)(b)(iii) against Does I, II and IV. This temporary restraining order shall remain effective unti l the issuance of a decision on the preliminary injunction request. A hearing on the preliminary injunction request (which may, uponagreement of counsel, be consolidated with a trial on the merits) is set for Thursday, January 24, 2019, starting at 2 :00 P.M. and concluding no later than 4:00 P.M. That hearing record may consist of stipulated facts, affidavits, witness testimony, or evidentiary exhibits unless counsel object and request a status conference as provided in paragraph 5 of this Order no later than January 18, 2019. Initial briefs shall be jointly submitted no later than the close of business on January 18, 2019. Reply briefs shall be jointly submitted no later than the close of business on January 22, 2019. Counsel may request a status conference with me prior to the hearing on the preliminary injunction by contacting my judicial assistant, Kris Leininger, at 402.437.1640. John Doe III is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKO)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. 11 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (CRZ)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Extend
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Reassignment Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Assignment of Judges
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?