IP Infusion, Inc. v. Fortinet, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 16CV296789

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2020 at 10:17 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Defendant/Cross Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina T Lo
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
Space Ognjen Zivojnovic
No Logo Ip Infusion, Inc., Plaintiff/Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adron G. Beene
No Logo Superior Court of California, Other

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara +1 831 454 2400
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Dismissed
Case Location Civil
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Dismissal - Entire Action
Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action
    Blank 41 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
    Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle and Request to Continue CMC
      Blank 40 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Notice
      CMC reset from 2/2/18 to 4/27/18
        Blank 39 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Notice
        CMC set for 2/2/18 at 10am in D5
          Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
            Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
              Blank 36 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
              Joint CMC Statement
                Blank 35 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Notice
                CMC set for 10/27/17 at 10am in D5
                  Blank 34 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Order After Hearing on 9/1/17 - Granting Defendant's Motion for Complex Designation - signed by Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                        Joint Case Management Statement
                          Blank 30 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                          Re Confidential Information, Granted by Judge Elfving (see order for details)
                            Blank 29 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Response/Reply
                            Reply
                              Blank 28 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Response/Reply
                              Reply
                                Blank 27 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case - signed by Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle (includes rescheduling of hearings)
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                  Opposition oto Def's Motion for Complex Designation by Plt (Adron W. Beene) 08/15/17 @9am in D3
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                    atty: Ognjen Zivojnovic
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                      Forinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Complex Designation; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities; 8/15/17; 9 am; D3; Atty John M. Neukom
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                            CMC
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                  CMC set for 6/13/17 at 10am in D3
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                        CMC statement.
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                            CMC set for 2/14/17 at 10am in D3
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                to Amended Cross Complaint
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                    CMC statement.
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Cross-Complaint (Amended) (No Fee)
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?