Cavalry SPV I, LLC v. Nguyen Ha
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 16CV298894

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 7:19 PM EDT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Casey M Jensen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jensen, Casey M +1 714 446 6686
v.
No Logo Ha, Nguyen, Defendant
Case Type Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Judgment Default
$4475.94
    Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order
    GRANTED copies in lieu of originals
      Blank 11 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
        Blank 10 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
        of case in supp of request for jgmt
          Blank 9 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
          of appl for entry of defaul jgmt
            Blank 8 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Declaration Ccp 1033
              Blank 7 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Dismissal
              DOES 1-10
                Blank 6 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Default Entered
                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                  summons, complaint, decl. ...
                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Affidavit: Venue
                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?