Nicholas Buchanan v. Security Risk Management, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 16CV299558

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 17, 2021 at 11:26 PM DT (2.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Buchanan, Nicholas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ALEXANDER LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Alexander +1 402 462 9989 +1 402 462 9939 cindy@rlalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapirshteyn, Nina

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shapirshteyn, Nina +1 650 307 3586
v.
No Logo Fielding, Francis Abraham-Lancaster, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minioza, Joseph J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Minioza, Joseph J. +1 510 832 7770
No Logo Finch, Arthur Wayne Finch, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Genereux, Robert, Defendant
No Logo Security Risk Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minioza, Joseph J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Minioza, Joseph J. +1 510 832 7770
No Logo Vf Mall LLC, Defendant
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
Atty Nina Shapirshteyn
    Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
      Blank 37 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        Blank 36 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        Atty: Shapirshteyn
          Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
            Blank 34 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
              Blank 33 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                Blank 32 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
                to 1st amended cmplt
                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                  New address.
                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
                    Order Setting Aside Default Judgment Against Def Arthur Wayne Finch, Jr. (Thomas McCarrick)
                      Blank 29 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                      Granted to Setting Aside Default Judgment Against Def Arthur Wayne Finch, Jr. , Answer may be filed within 15 Days from Service of this Order (Thomas McCarrick) Signed by Judge Folan
                        Blank 28 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                        Stip & Order allowing the filing of the answer of Def - An order is needed prior to filing the answer since default has already been entered.
                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                          Answer - Default entered 1/27/17
                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Default Entered
                            **Order filed on 2-16-17 Granted to Set Aside Default **
                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                              $150 jury fee deposited by defs.
                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                  against: ARTHUR WAYNE FINCH, JR. / ON FAC
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                      atty Brydon
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                        Re: 11-17-16 motion to amend - GRANTED by Judge Folan
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
                                          1st amended
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                            1st amended
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                atty: Crittondon
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Motion: Amend
                                                            notice of motion and motion to amend complaint to correct misnomer; memo of Ps and As; decl of Nina G. shapirshteyn; 11/17/16 at 9am, dept 8; atty Shapirshteyn
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                $150.00 jury fees paid for plt by atty Shapirshteyn
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,571 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?