Minoo Majd v. Jose Hernandez et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 16CV299875
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 7:48 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Majd, Minoo, Plaintiff

Represented by Edward L Hummer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Horowitz, Michael A. +1 925 825 9500
v.
No Logo Cagwin & Dorward, Defendant

Represented by Tadlock, Lyn D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
No Logo DSW Equipment Associates, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Tadlock, Lyn D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Hernandez, Jose A., Defendant

Represented by Tadlock, Lyn D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
Attributes
Case Type Auto Unlimited (22)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
Entire Case/Unconditional (Michael Horowitz)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Referral: Mediation
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
New address and telephone numbers.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Atty Silverstein
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Horowitz
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 12 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?