Gathmann, et al v. Panstwowe Zaklady, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-01917-FAK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cathleen Gathmann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. McCadden +8288 828 828 8701
No Logo Jay Gathmann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. McCadden +8288 828 828 8701
v.
No Logo Panstwowe Zaklady Lotnicze [PZL] "Warszawa-Okecie" S.A., Defendant
No Logo Pezetel Foreign Trade Enterprise Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Space Christopher R. Christensen +1 212 490 9100

Toggle Switch Represented by Semmes, Bowen & Semmes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Newman Farquharson +1 410 539 5040 +1 410 539 5223 pfarquharson@semmes.com
Space Robert Edward Scott, Jr. +1 410 576 4725 +1 410 539 5223 rscott@semmes.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/20/1996
Jury Demand None
Demand $7000000
Nature of Suit 315 - Personal Injury: Airplane Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore County
Terminated 7/1/1997
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 03-C-96-000363[CC For Balto. County]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: 7/30/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 OrderCourt Filing
    (COPY) ORDER "DISMISSING" the case as SETTLED without prejudice as to all claims; "DIRECTING" each party to bear their own costs unless otherwise agreed; "ALLOWING" any party to move to reopen for good cause within 45 days of this order. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 10/28/96 c/m 10/30/96 micro 10/31/96-lew original filed in K-96-1738) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Settlement Conference
      Settlement conference held before Kaufman, SJ. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 9/18/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM "SETTING" a settlement conference for 10/24/96 at 9a.m. in chambers. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey 9/18/96 c/m 9/18/96) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 9/8/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey for settlement conference. (signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 8/27/96 c/m 9/8/96-hg) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
            NOTICE of voluntary dismissal pursuant to the stipulated agreement filed in 95-1738. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of withdrawal of motion to remand by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM and ORDER "REFERRING" to the on the record Telephone converence held on July 30, 1996 as therein set forth ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) dated July 30, 1996 (c/m 8/7/96 dam) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Remark
                  Reassignment letter sent to all parties and judicial officers respectively. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 7/31/1996 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT by Sylwester Pieckowski for Pezetel Foreign Re: [7-1] motion to Vacate the May 24, 1996 Order of Default by Pezetel Foreign (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Telephone Conference
                      Tele-conference held before Kaufman, SJ. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Response in Support of Motion
                        MEMORANDUM by Pezetel Foreign with exhibit A in support of [7-1] motion to Vacate the May 24, 1996 Order of Default by Pezetel Foreign (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996, Terminated: 7/1/1997 Motion to Remand
                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann to Remand , and for Special Hearing on same filed with exhibits A-H. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 Response in Opposition
                            RESPONSE by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann in opposition to [7-1] motion by defendant Pezetel Foreign Trade to Vacate the May 24, 1996 Order of Default, memorandum, affidavit, request for hearing and attachments. (c/s) (vws, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/16/1996
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              CASE reassigned from Judge Andre` M. Davis to Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996, Terminated: 7/1/1997 Answer
                                ANSWER to Complaint by Pezetel Foreign. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                  MOTION by Pezetel Foreign to Consolidate Case with K-95-1738 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Remark
                                    Notice of Removal Mailed to Counsel. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Motion to Vacate
                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Pezetel Foreign to Vacate the May 24, 1996 Order of Default and Exhibit A. (c/s) (Original Affidavit received June 24, 1996) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 06/25/1996
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                        NOTICE of Hearing/Trial: July 11, 1996 at 9:30 a.m. Civil Non-Jury Trial in Circuit Court for Baltimore County . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                          NOTICE of Default Order to Pezetel Foreign Trade Enterprise Co., Ltd. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Summons Issued
                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for Pezetel Foreign. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT filed; (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE by Pezetel Foreign of Filing of Removal. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Notice of Removal
                                                  NOTICE OF DEFENDANT PEZETEL FOREIGN TRADE ENTERPRISE, LTD. ("PEZETEL") OF REMOVAL; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 133045 (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Remark
                                                    Above pleadings are all copies of papers filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore County, Maryland. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?