Iris Chan v. American Tire Distributors, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 16CV302034

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 9:00 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chan, Iris, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo American Tire Distributors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hernandez, Erick, Defendant
Case Type Auto Unlimited (22)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
    Blank 5 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
    Entire Case, Unconditional (Jeff Richard)
      Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
        Blank 3 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
          Blank 2 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
            Blank 1 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

              Space Space

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 0 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?