Netgear, Inc. v. Dealspointer
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 16CV302105

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 9:03 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

NetGear, Inc. NetGear, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Dealspointer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nishita T Patel
Case Type Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
    Blank 11 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
      Blank 10 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
      $150.00 jury fee paid for Plaintiff by Atty Rhow
        Blank 9 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Declaration
        of Aparna Mathur, In Response to the Order for Further CMC
          Blank 8 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
            Blank 7 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
            Atty Patel
              Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
              Atty Rhow
                Blank 5 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                    Blank 3 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?