Waraich v. Fry's Electronics, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 16CV302944

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 9:31 PM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Waraich, Arvinder, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ari J Stiller
Space Kelsey McCullough Szamet

Represented by Kingsley and Kingsley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric B. Kingsley +1 818 990 8300 +1 818 990 2903 eric@kingsleykingsley.com
No Logo Delgado, Nestor, Petitioner

Represented by Blanchard Krasner & French

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Hawkes dhawkes@bkflaw.com
No Logo Warner, Alexander, Petitioner
v.
No Logo FRY'S ELECTRONICS, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Jay Simmons +1 213 617 5518 +1 213 620 1398 rsimmons@sheppardmullin.com
Space Matthew Martin Sonne +1 714 513 5100 +1 714 513 5130 msonne@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo Delgado, Nestor, Intervenor
No Logo Hashim, Ali, Intervenor

Represented by Blanchard Krasner & French

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Hawkes dhawkes@bkflaw.com
No Logo Richman, Gina, Intervenor

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Hawkes dhawkes@bkflaw.com

Represented by The Emge Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek John Emge +1 619 595 1400 +1 619 595 1480 derek@emgelawfirm.com
No Logo Warner, Alexander, Intervenor

Represented by Barry R Himmelstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry R Himmelstein +1 415 457 5364
No Logo Richman, Gina, Objector
No Logo Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Other

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara +1 831 454 2400
Case Type Other Employment Unlimited (15)
Case Status Appealed
Case Location Civil
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Notice-Related Cases
Samuel Kaminsky v. Fry's Electronics, Inc., Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG18900887
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 61 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice-Related Cases
    Samuel Kaminsky v. Fry's Electronics, Inc., Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG18900887
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 60 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Appeal Receipt for Record
      from DCA
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 59 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Appeal Receipt for Record
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 58 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Appeal: Notice of Completion
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 57 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Appeal: Notice to Court Reporter
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 56 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Appeal: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance
              for Arvinder Waraich
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 55 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Deposit: Reporter's Transcript
                $325 deposited
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 54 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Appeal: Cross-Appellant's Default Notice
                  Amended to show correct parties
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 53 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                    Notice of Correct Address for Attorney Ari J. Stiller
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 52 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Deposit: Reporter's Transcript
                      $325.00 deposited for Fry's Electronics Inc. by check
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 51 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Appeal: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance
                        curing default issued 8/24/2017 for Appellant Frys Electronics
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 50 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Deposit: Reporter's Transcript
                          $325.00 deposit -- taken on ntc of undoc action.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 49 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Appeal: Appellant's Default Notice
                            RT deposit not timely deposited
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 48 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Appeal: Cross-Appellant's Default Notice
                              RT deposit not timely deposited
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 47 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Notice-Related Cases
                                Arpineh Hakhanian v. Fry's, Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC654609
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 46 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None DESIGNATION
                                  Cross Appellant's Notice Designation on Appeal
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 45 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Notice-Cross-Appeal
                                    filed by Arvinder Waraich and Christina Chornomud, with deposit for clerks transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 44 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Notice-Appeal
                                      filed by Fry's Electronics and deposit for clerks transcripts
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 43 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                        Order After 12/23/16 Hearing (Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan (DENIED)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 42 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                          CMC reset from 4/7/17 to 4/14/17
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 41 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                            Order Granting Respondent Fry's Electronics, Inc.'s Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 as to the Hon. Brian C. Walsh
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 40 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                              M. Sonne ISO CCP 170.6
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 39 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                ISO CCP 170.6
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6Court Filing
                                                  as to Judge Brian C. Walsh
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Motion Order
                                                    Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene (3/10/17, 9am, D1)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                      David C. Hawkes
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                                          Proposed Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                              Opposition to Warner's Ex Parte
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO VACATE
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  Notice of Serving Court's Notice of Case Management Conference
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                    Joint Objection
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                      Joint Response
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                        Respondent Fry's Electronics, Inc.'s Response and Joinder to Petitioners' Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          Hearing on Petition by Plaintiffs to Confirm Arbitration Award is reset from 12/16/16 to 12/23/16 - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Brief - Reply
                                                                            Sur-Reply in opposition to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Order: Deeming Case ComplexCourt Filing
                                                                              ...and Staying Discovery - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                Civil Lawsuit Notice (1st CMC set for 4/7/2017 at 10am in D1; assigned to Judge Brian C. Walsh)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Brian C. Walsh
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                    Amended Notice of Motion to Intervene (3/10/17, 9am, D1)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Motion Order
                                                                                      Motion to Intervene (3/10/17, 9am, D1)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Motion Order
                                                                                        Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (12/16/16, 9am, D1)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                          Matthew Sonne Declaration in Opposition to Petition to Vacate Award
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                            Joint Opposition to Petition to Vacate Award
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Request
                                                                                              Request For Judicial Notice in opposition to Petition to Vacate Award
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Notice-Related Cases
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Notice-Related Cases
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                    Opposition to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Petition to Vacate Award ++
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Errata
                                                                                                      Notice of Errata Removing John P. Castro as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                        Notice of Ruling re Ex Parte Application for Order Granting Preference and Setting Hearing Date
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                                                                                            Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Errata
                                                                                                              Notice of Errata Re Omission of Exhibit A from Decl of Eric B. Kingsley ISO Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, and from Proposed Order Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Errata
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Granting Respondent Fry's Electronics, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application for Preference and Setting Hearing Date for Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (11/22/16, 10am, D1)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                                                                                                      Proposed Judgment Based on Confirmed Arbitration Award
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                          Declaration of Eric B. Kingsley In Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing and Petition Pursuant to C.C.P Section Code 1285 and 9 U.S.C. Section Code 9 to Confirm Arbitration Award; Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?