NetGear, Inc. v. WirelessWorld et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 16CV303233

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 9:42 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

NetGear, Inc. NetGear, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Alabed, Felipe, Defendant
No Logo Alabed, Noor, Defendant
No Logo Nunu's Mobile Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Best for Less, Defendant
No Logo WirelessWorld, Defendant
Case Type Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Default Pending
    Blank 31 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
      Blank 30 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Declaration Ccp 585
      Declaration in Support of Request for Default Judgment
        Blank 29 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Declaration Ccp 585
        Declaration in Support of Request for Default Judgment
          Blank 28 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Summary Of Case
          Summary of Case
            Blank 27 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Order: Proposed
            ***PENDING JGMT***
              Blank 26 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Request Dismissal
              DOES 5-50
                Blank 25 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Default Pending
                Request for Court Judgment
                  Blank 24 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Default Pending
                    Blank 23 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Default Pending
                    BASIC
                      Blank 22 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Default Pending
                      BASIC
                        Blank 21 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                          Blank 20 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                              Blank 18 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                Blank 17 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                  For 1st amended complaint
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                                    FIRST; Atty Rkow
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                      Application for Order for Publication of Summons Returned. Order for Publication Was Issued on 4-27-17.
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Default Not Entered
                                          Complaint has been amended -- 2/16/18.
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Publication/Posting
                                            PUBLICATION
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Publication/Posting
                                              POS of Summons
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                    app for publication of summons is GRANTED. (Judge Elfving) *see for further details
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Request for Order to service/summons by post or publication
                                                      (Aparna S. Mathur)
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                        of ex parte app to cont. cmc & for extension of time (Aparna S. Mathur)
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Application and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                          for extension of time to serve & to cont cmc is GRANTED. CMC is cont. to 5/30/17 10am D-3. Pleading must be served by 4/30/17. (Aparna S. Mathur) Signed by Judge Elfving
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?