Sheila Still v. F&H Construction, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara,
Case No. 16CV303302
|
|
|
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 9:44 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) |
Update Alerts Jump |
Summary Parties Attributes Timeline |
Summary |
No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.
|
|
Parties |
|
 |
Still, Julia, Plaintiff |
|
|
|
|
 |
Still, Julie, Plaintiff |
|
|
|
|
 |
Still, Sheila, Plaintiff |
|
|
|
|
v. |
|
|
 |
F&H Construction, Inc., Defendant |
|
|
▼ Represented by Crenshaw Ware & Martin PLC
|
|
 |
RGW Construction, Inc., Defendant |
|
|
▼ Represented by Tadlock, Lyn D
|
|
 |
The City of Morgan Hill, Defendant |
|
|
▼ Represented by Crenshaw Ware & Martin PLC
|
|
Other Parties |
|
|
 |
Still, Julie, Successor In Interest |
|
|
|
|
|
Attributes |
Case Type |
Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23) |
Case Status |
Active |
Case Location |
Civil |
|
|
Timeline |
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None |
Minute Order |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
29 |
Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None |
Minute Order |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
28 |
Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name |
|
Notice of Change of Address
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
27 |
Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None |
Minute Order |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
26 |
Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
25 |
Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
Still CMC Statement for 050118 (Signed)
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
24 |
Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
Case Management Statement
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
23 |
Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None |
Minute Order |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
22 |
Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
21 |
Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
20 |
Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
19 |
Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None |
Minute Order |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
18 |
Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
For: Julie Still for herself & as successor in interest to Sheila Still
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
17 |
Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
16 |
Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None |
Answer-Amended Complaint |
|
To 1st amended complaint; Atty Silverstein
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
15 |
Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None |
Answer-Amended Complaint |
|
Answer to First Amended Complaint- Atty Montalvo
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
14 |
Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None |
Complaint - Amended |
|
first of amended *no summons issued*
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
13 |
Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None |
Stipulation and Order |
|
Plf may file the proposed first amended complaint ; Ordered by Judge Folan
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
12 |
Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None |
Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte |
|
PENDING to amend the complaint (Louis S. Abronson, Jenny A. Silverstein & Jose A. Montalvo)
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
11 |
Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) |
|
To complaint; Atty Jenny A. Silverstein
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
10 |
Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None |
Minute Order |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
9 |
Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None |
Statement: Case Management Conference |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
8 |
Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None |
Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) |
|
$150 jury fee deposited.
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
7 |
Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) |
|
Answer to complt. Atty Montalvo.
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
6 |
Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
5 |
Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
4 |
Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
3 |
Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None |
Summons: Issued/Filed |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
2 |
Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
1 |
Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None |
Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
|
|
Request |
|
 |
Date: 11/6/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 11/6/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 11/6/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 11/6/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/28/2018, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 5/1/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 5/1/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 5/1/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 5/1/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 5/1/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 5/1/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 1/30/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 1/30/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 1/30/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 1/30/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 1/30/2018, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Continued: Court's Motion |
|
 |
Date: 8/29/2017, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/29/2017, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/29/2017, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 8/29/2017, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
 |
Date: 3/28/2017, Time: 03:30:00, Status: None |
|
Held |
|
|
|
Statistics
This case has been viewed 1 time.
|
|
|