Netgear, Inc. v. TheHappyStore
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 17CV305304

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2018 at 10:52 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

NetGear, Inc. NetGear, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo TheHappyStore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deepali Apurva Brahmbhatt +1 650 815 2604 +1 650 815 2601 dbrahmbhatt@sheppardmullin.com
Case Type Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
    Blank 12 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
      Blank 11 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
      Granted Extended to Response by 6-27-17 to Serve and file an Answer, Mtn, Demurrer or any other Resonse (Signed by Judge Folan)
        Blank 10 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
          Blank 9 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
            of Choon L Gan in supp of Def
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                Blank 6 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Motion-Quash
                June 13, 2017; 9a,; dept 8; motion to quash service of summons and complaint/m&a's
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                  of Aparn S. Mathur in support of Plt's Ex Parte Application for extension of time to serve
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)Court Filing
                    for an order to continue cmc and extend time to serve def is GRANTED. CMC is cont. 7/11/17 3pm D-8. Pleading must be served and filed by 6/20/17. (Eklwan E. Rhow) Signed byJudge Folan
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?