Mary Lou Nelson v. State of California, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 17CV312168

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 2:58 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nelson, Mary Lou, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne J. Kapner +1 408 287 9501
No Logo Nelson, Sara, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne J. Kapner +1 408 287 9501
No Logo Nelson, Thomas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne J. Kapner +1 408 287 9501
v.
No Logo California Department of Transportation, Defendant
No Logo Central Striping Service, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burnham Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Caleo +1 510 444 6800 +1 510 835 6666 pcaleo@burnhambrown.com
No Logo State Of California, Department of Transportation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Joseph Rodriguez
No Logo Traffic Solutions Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roberts, Lisa Renee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Borges, Guy Douglas +1 510 939 5330
No Logo Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inc, Defendant/Cross Def/Cross Compl

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Kay Stinnett
No Logo Central Striping Service, Inc., Defendant/Cross Def/Cross Compl
No Logo Traffic Solutions Corp, Defendant/Cross Def/Cross Compl
No Logo Corcoran, Crystal, Cross Defendant/Cross Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W Shaver +1 818 905 6001 nb@skc-law.com
Case Type Auto Unlimited (22)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 87 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order: Ex Parte
Granted to Continue Trial date
    Blank 86 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
    Application to specially set MSA within 30 days of the trial, by atty Rodriguez.
      Blank 85 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
      of Kevin J. Rodriguez ISO Bay Cities' MSA
        Blank 84 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
          Blank 83 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
          of Daniel Melcher ISO Bay Cities' MSA
            Blank 82 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
            of Kevin Barker ISO Bay Cities' MSA
              Blank 81 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
              of Nilesh Pandya ISO Bay Cities' MSA
                Blank 80 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                of Ben Rodriguez ISO Bay Cities' MSA
                  Blank 79 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Evidence
                  HRG - 1/8/19 - Bay Cities' Volume of Evidence ISO MSA
                    Blank 78 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Separate Statement
                      Blank 77 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
                      Ntc of Mtn and Mtn for Summary Ajudication 01/08/19 9:00am Dept. 19 Atty Stinnett
                        Blank 76 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                        #2039605 Motion for Summary Judgment + Supporting Docs- motion needs to list in title hearing date, time, and department
                          Blank 75 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
                          substituting Doe 6: Central Striping Service, Inc. Doe 7: Traffic Solutions Corp. dba Statewide Traffic Safety & Signs, Inc.
                            Blank 74 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                              Blank 73 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                              Case Management Statement
                                Blank 72 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                Proposed Order (COVER SHEET)
                                  Blank 71 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Notice-Ruling
                                    Blank 70 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                      Blank 69 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                        Blank 68 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                        Granting ADR Stip & Order for Michel Omstill to serve as Mediator on 07/18/18 by Judge Kirwan
                                          Blank 67 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                            Blank 66 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Notice-Ruling
                                              Blank 65 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                Blank 64 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                Declaration
                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO CRYSTAL CORCORAN'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                    **Amended** Answer to Cross-Complaint
                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Notice-Ruling
                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Notice-Ruling
                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                            Declaration of Luanne Rutherford. Hrg 03/01/18 D19 9am
                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                              Opposition to Motion for Good Faith Settlement. HRG 03/01/2018
                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Answer-Cross-Complaint
                                                                BAY CITIES PAVING & GRADING, INC. S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CENTRAL STRIPING SERVICES, INC.
                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
                                                                  NAMING DOES - DOE 1: California Department of Transportation / DOE 2: Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inc.
                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                      AMENDED
                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Notice-Ruling
                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              re:MTS portions of the X-Complaint (Judge Kirwan)
                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
                                                                                      Answer to amended complaint. Atty Caleo
                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Motion: Good Faith Settlement
                                                                                        and dismissal of cross complaint, atty: Tina M. Bhatia. HD: 2/13/2018, 8:30AM, D19
                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Answer-Cross-Complaint
                                                                                          Atty: Guy Borges; to x-complt of Central Striping Services, Inc.
                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                                            Answer to amendment to complaint. Atty Borges
                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Answer-Cross-Complaint
                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                                                                                                Portions of the cross-complaint filed by Central Striping Service, Inc.; Atty Stinnett, 02/06/2018, 9AM, D8
                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Answer-Cross-Complaint
                                                                                                    of Central Striping Service, Inc.; Atty Shaver
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
                                                                                                        Naming DOE 11 and DOE 12; Atty Kepner
                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                          $ 150 paid, atty: Rutherford.
                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                              to Cross Complaint. atty: Rutherford.
                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                Summons issued. atty: Rutherford.
                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Answer-Cross-Complaint
                                                                                                                  atty: Rutherford.
                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
                                                                                                                    Taken on Answer to Cross Complaint. Atty: Borges. & atty: Rutherford.
                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Answer-Cross-Complaint
                                                                                                                      Atty Stinnett
                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                            $150 jury fee deposited by Atty Ehret for Defendants Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inv & CalTrans.
                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                Atty Shaver. *No summons issued*
                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Answer-Cross-Complaint
                                                                                                                                  Answer to cross complaint. Atty Shaver.
                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
                                                                                                                                    taken on answer to cross complaint
                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                        For cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                          Atty Caleo
                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                            To Bay Cities Paving's cross-complaint; Atty Caleo
                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                                                                                                Old: Jacobs; New: Rodriguez
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                  $ 150 paid for all plaintiffs. By atty: Kepner.
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                          Summons and Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                              to Complaint, atty: Jacobs
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  Summons issued. atty: Stinnett
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                    to Complaint, atty: Stinnett
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Proof of Service of Summons (Served party: Bay Cities Paving & Grading, Inc) - missing original signature.
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?