Fortinet, Inc. v. David Ryder
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 17CV312447

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 3:08 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
v.
No Logo Ryder, David, Respondent
Case Type Other Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
[proposed] ord granting mtn to confirm arb; decl re: fees/costs (Zivojnovic)
    Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Declaration
    of Ognjen Zivojnovic establishing fees/costs incurred in this action (Zivojnovic)
      Blank 8 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
        Blank 7 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
          Blank 6 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Motion: Confirm Arbitration Award
          Ntc of mtn and mtn. 12/05/2017 9:00am Dept 13. Atty Neukom
            Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
              Blank 4 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
              Affidavit of service.
                Blank 3 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                to Complaint
                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?