Decipher, Inc. v. Roy Lipman
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-03271-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Decipher Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Roy Lipman Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Max Lipman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 10/17/1996
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Motion to Quash
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 1/17/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 2:96-cv547[E.D. of Virginia]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Remark
A certified copy of docket sheet and all pleadings TRANSFERRED to the U.S.D.C. for the Eastern District of Virginia. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER dated 1/16/97 that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, Norfolk Division for consolidation, as appropriate with 96-547 and that the Clerk of Court CLOSE this Case. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis ) (c/m BE) (microfilmed 1/23/97) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997 Terminated Case
      Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER to counsel re: hearing on the motion to quash subpoena ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 1/6/97; c/m bel ) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/9/1997 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT and request for hearing by Decipher, Inc. (c/s) (nrm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/09/1997
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 10/17/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Motion to Quash
            MOTION with memorandum in support by Max Lipman to Quash Subpoena . (cag, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 81 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?