Norman Ng v. Mario Mercado et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 17SC071848

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 6:54 AM EDT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ng, Norman, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Mercado, Mario, Defendant
No Logo Torres, Miriam, Defendant
Case Type Small Claims $5,001 - $10,000
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice
    Blank 11 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
      Blank 10 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)
      Reset req'd by plt.
        Blank 9 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Plaintiff's Claim (Amended) (No change in no claim amount)
          Blank 8 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)
          Reset req'd by plt.
            Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed
              Blank 6 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed
                Blank 5 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed
                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant
                  #70161370000002649538.
                    Blank 3 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant
                    #70161370000002649521.
                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant
                      #70161370000002649514.
                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?