Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan v. Rando AAA HVAC, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 17CV319517

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 7:01 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Rando AAA HVAC, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch & Loofbourrow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Frank Vierra +1 415 397 2800
Case Type Product Liability Unlimited (24)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Request Dismissal
Request for Dismissal (Dismissals)
    Blank 10 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
      Blank 9 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
        Blank 8 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
        $150 deposited for def by atty: Jesse Kershner
          Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
            Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
            To Complaint; Atty Vierra
              Blank 5 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
              Proof of Service By Mail - Missing Original Signature
                Blank 4 Filed: 1/6/2018, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                Proof of Service of Summons and Proof of Service by Mail or missing original signatures or 'By Fax'
                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 1 time.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?