Eggleston v. Electronic M.P. Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-03567-CCB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo York Eggleston, IV, Plaintiff

Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Lescht +1 202 463 6036 +1 202 463 6067 alan.lescht@leschtlaw.com
v.
No Logo Electronic Motivational Programs, Inc., Defendant

Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/14/1996
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $167000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore County
Terminated 5/28/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 5/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I, II, III, V and VII and Counts IV and VI are DISMISSED without prejudice. (signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 5/28/99) (c/m & microfilmed 5/28/99 bc) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 5/28/1999 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION (signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 5/28/99) (c/m 5/28/99 bc) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 5/28/1999 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/24/1999 Response in Support of Motion
        REPLY MEMORANDUM by Electronic M.P. Inc. in support of [18-1] its motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999, Terminated: 2/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to File Brief Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 2/19/99) (c/m 2/19/99 bc) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999, Terminated: 2/22/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
            LETTER/MOTION by Electronic M.P. Inc. to Extend Time to File Brief Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (mms, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999, Terminated: 5/28/1999 Response in Opposition
              RESPONSE by York Eggleston IV in opposition to [18-1] motion of Defendant for Summary Judgment and Exhibit 1 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 1/29/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER EXTENDING the time for plaintiff to file an opposition to the summary judgment motion to 2/5/99 ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 1/28/99) (c/m 1/29/99 bc)) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER EXTENDING the time for plaintiff to file an opposition to the summary judgment motion to 1/29/99 ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 1/15/99) (c/m 1/15/99 bc ) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998, Terminated: 5/28/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Electronic M.P. Inc. for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-12 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998, Terminated: 12/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [17-1] letter motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 12/17/98) (c/m 12/17/98 bc) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998, Terminated: 12/17/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        Letter MOTION by Electronic M.P. Inc. to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 9/23/98) (c/m 9/23/98 bc) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM requesting counsel to submit a status report by 9/22/98 ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 9/8/98 ) (c/m by chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Add and Terminate Judges
                              CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Settlement Conference
                                Settlement conference held before Grimm, USMJ. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  INFORMAL LETTER ORDER "ADVISING" counsel of settlement conference rescheduled for 9/14/98 at 9:30 a.m. as therein more particularly set forth. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm 6/9/98 ) (c/m 6/10/98 jnf) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    INFORMAL LETTER ORDER "ADVISING" counsel of second settlement conference scheduled for 6/10/98 at 9:30 a.m. as therein more particularly set forth. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm 4/14/98; c/m 4/15/98 jnf ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998, Terminated: 1/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER "GRANTING" [12-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery to 30 days beyond the mediation date of 2/6/98. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 1/20/98; c/m chambers ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998, Terminated: 1/20/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        Letter MOTION by Electronic M.P. Inc. to Extend Time to complete discovery to 30 days beyond the mediation date of 2/6/98 . (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998, Terminated: 1/20/1998 Status Report
                                          STATUS REPORT by Electronic M.P. Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: 11/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER "SETTING" Date for Settlement Conference. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm 11/18/97 ) (c/m 11/18/97-jf) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/19/1997 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm for settlement or other ADR conference. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 11/6/97; referred 11/10/97; cc 11/12/97 hsg ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/19/1997, Terminated: 11/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER "GRANTING" [9-1] motion to Extend Time of discovery schedule as therein more particularly set forth. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 11/6/97; c/m 11/7/97 bc ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/19/1997, Terminated: 11/13/1997 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                  Letter MOTION by York Eggleston IV, Electronic M.P. Inc. to Extend Time of discovery schedule . (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/19/1997, Terminated: 11/13/1997 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by York Eggleston IV, Electronic M.P. Inc. (received in chambers 11/6/97) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997, Terminated: 7/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER "GRANTING" [8-1] joint motion to Extend Time of discovery schedule and additional 90 days as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 7/23/97; c/m ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997, Terminated: 7/23/1997 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                        JOINT MOTION by York Eggleston IV, Electronic M.P. Inc. to Extend Time of discovery schedule and additional 90 days . (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997, Terminated: 7/23/1997 Status Report
                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by York Eggleston IV, Electronic M.P. Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 Rule
                                                            Defendant's Rule 26 expert witness disclosures. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 3/26/97; c/m chambers ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/26/1997 Answer
                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Electronic M.P. Inc. (Attorney George C. Davis), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997, Terminated: 3/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER "GRANTING" [4-1] joint motion that the defendant's initial response shall be due by 3/24/97. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 3/21/97; c/m chambers ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997, Terminated: 3/24/1997 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    JOINT MOTION by York Eggleston IV, Electronic M.P. Inc. that the defendant's initial response shall be due by 3/24/97 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Electronic M.P. Inc. 1/25/97 Answer due on 2/24/97 for Electronic M.P. Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Summons Issued
                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for Electronic M.P. Inc. (30 Days) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Jury Demand
                                                                          DEMAND for jury trial As To Certain Counts by York Eggleston IV (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 123894 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?