Superior Appellate Supreme
State
Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara California Court of Appeals CA Supreme Court

Fernando Murrain v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 18CV334861

Tags
Last Updated July 10, 2021 at 5:05 PM DT (1.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Murrain, Fernando, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M. Peck +1 801 521 0844 lisa@peck-law.com
v.
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "SOLARCITY"
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cheryl Johnson-Hartwell +1 213 236 0600 +1 213 236 2700 cjohnhart@bwslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Scott Cowie +1 415 439 6210 +1 415 520 9816 pcowie@littler.com
Space Babak G. Yousefzadeh +1 415 433 1940 +1 415 399 8490 byousefzadeh@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Payne & Fears LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Crawford Lewis +1 415 398 7860 +1 415 398 7863 mcl@paynefears.com
No Logo Superior Court of California, Notice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara +1 831 454 2400
Case Type Wrongful Termination Unlimited (36)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 116 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Deposit: Clerk's Transcript
$100.00 check deposited for Clerk's Transcript for Appellant Tesla, Inc.
    Blank 115 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
    Notice: Entry of Order
      Blank 114 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal
      Env. 6798268
        Blank 113 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
          Legal Document 112 Filed: 7/5/2021, Entered: None Order: Submitted Matter
          Re: 7-01-21 1) Motion by Defendant Tesla, Inc. for Reconsideration of Order Awarding Attorney's Fees; (2) Motion by Defendant Tesla, Inc. for Reconsideration of Order Terminating Arbitration.
            Legal Document 111 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
              Blank 110 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
              Continued Mtn to Quash and CMC to 9-21-21
                Blank 109 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                Reply ISO Def. Tesla Motion for Reconsideration of Order Awarding Attorneys Fees
                  Blank 108 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                  Declaration John D. Ellis ISO Def. Tesla Motion for Reconsideration of Order Awarding Attorneys Fees
                    Blank 107 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Request
                    Request for Judicial Notice ISO Def. Tesla Motion for Reconsideration of Order Awarding Attorney Fees
                      Blank 106 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                      Reply ISO Def. Tesla Motion for Reconsideration Order Terminating Arbitration
                        Blank 105 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                        Declaration John D. Ellis ISO Def. Tesla Motion for Reconsideration of Order Terminating Arbitration
                          Blank 104 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Request
                          Request for Judicial Notice ISO Def Tesla Motion for Reconsideration of Order Terminating Arbitration
                            Blank 103 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                            Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Order Terminating Arbitration
                              Blank 102 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                              Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Order Terminating Arbitration
                                Blank 101 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                Declaration of Kevin Schwin IOT Motion for Reconsideration of Order Terminating Arbitration
                                  Blank 100 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                  Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees
                                    Blank 99 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                    Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees
                                      Blank 98 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                      Declaration of Kevin Schwin IOT Motion for Reconsideration of Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees
                                        Blank 97 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                        Proof of Service
                                          Blank 96 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                            Legal Document 95 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                            Order & Notice of Hearing on Tesla, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration: HRG 7/1/21; opposition due 6/3/21; reply due 6/17/21 - signed/SRK.
                                              Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                              Order & Notice of Hearing on Tesla, Inc.'s Motions for Reconsideration: HRG 7/1/21 at 1:30pm D1 SRK; opposition due 6/3/21; reply due 6/17/21 - signed/SRK.
                                                Legal Document 93 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                Reply
                                                  Legal Document 92 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                  Reply Declaration
                                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                    Hrg 5-18-21 D7 Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for a Protective Order
                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                      Declaration of J Ellis in Support of Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for a Protective Order
                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
                                                        re: reporter Jane Hong-Elsey - GRANTED by Judge Rudy
                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                            Case Management Statement
                                                              Legal Document 86 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                              Case Management Statement
                                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Motion-Reconsideration
                                                                DEFENDANT TESLA, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER TERMINATING ARBITRA
                                                                  Legal Document 84 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                    Legal Document 83 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                    BABAK YOUSEFZADEH
                                                                      Legal Document 82 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Motion-Reconsideration
                                                                      HRG 7/1/21; opposition due 6/3/21; reply due 6/17/21.
                                                                        Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                        HRG 7/1/21; opposition due 6/3/21; reply due 6/17/21.
                                                                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                          HRG 7/1/21; opposition due 6/3/21; reply due 6/17/21.
                                                                            Legal Document 79 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                            Substitution of Attorney
                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                              Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion
                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Order: Submitted Matter
                                                                                Re: 3-16-21 Mtn for Attorneys' Fees
                                                                                  Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Motion (Amended)
                                                                                  5-18-21 Amended Notice of Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Protective Order; And Request for Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant and Its Counsel
                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                      Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                      Reply
                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                        Declaration
                                                                                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                          Hrg 3-16-21 D7 Opposition to Mtn for Sancts
                                                                                            Legal Document 71 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                            Hrg 3-16-21 D7 Declaration
                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              Stipulated Protective Order is GRANTED, signed Judge Rudy. [Env# 5913202]
                                                                                                Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Motion-Quash
                                                                                                Hrg 5-18-21 D7 Motion: Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order
                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                  Memorandum of Points & Authorities
                                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                    Declaration
                                                                                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                      Memorandum of Points & Authorities
                                                                                                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                        Declaration
                                                                                                          Legal Document 64 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Motion-Sanctions
                                                                                                          Hrg 3-16-21 D7
                                                                                                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                            Re Briefing and hearing schedule for Mon. Sancts
                                                                                                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POS
                                                                                                              Hrg: 12-17-20 re: Mtn to Terminate Arbitration **Please order for details**
                                                                                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Motion to Vacate Order Staying Proceedings and Election to Withdraw from Arbitration Per CCP 1281.98 and Request for Sanctions Per CCP 1281.99
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                    Declaration of Elizabeth M. Peck Supporting Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion to Vacate Order Staying Proceedings and Election to Withdraw from Arbitration Per CCP 1281.98 and Request for sanctions Per CCP 1281.99
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                      Opposition
                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                        Env.#5424682; First paper fee's of $435.00 need to be paid for Solar City.
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          GRANTED, signed Judge Kulkarni. [Env# 5449706]
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                            Opposition
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              re: Order Granting Ex parte applicaiton to grant, or alternatively to shorten time to hear, Motion to vacate: See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Kulkarni, Dept. 8. EFS 11/25/20rb
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                Env.#5352433; 1st paper fee's need to be paid for defendant Solar City of $435.00.
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Declaration of Elizabeth M. Peck
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Motion: Set Aside/Vacate
                                                                                                                                      HRG 1-28-21 D7 Motion to Vacate Order Staying Proceedings. Hearing TBD, Atty Peck
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                        HRG 1-28-21 D7 Motion to Vacate Order Staying Proceedings. Hearing TBD, Atty Peck of Elizabeth M. Peck ISO Motion to Vacate Stay.
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Notice-Ruling
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Continued CMC/Hearing
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                                                                                                    Old Atty: Lewis / New Atty: Johnson-Hartwell
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement and Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Order concerning Defendant's Motion to Compel arbitration and For Stay: The Court GRANTS the petition to compel arbitration and STAYS this case. Signed by Judge Kulkarni, D08; See Order for Details
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                    HRG 06/25/19 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Plaintiff Fernando Murrain ISO Memorandum Opposing Motion to Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Elizabeth M. Peck ISO Memorandum Opposing Motion to Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement (Further CMC)
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                Of Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    To Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action: The Court hereby Orders that the hearing date for Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action shall be continued to June 25, 2019 at 9:00, D08; Signed by Judge Kulkarni, D08; See Order for Details
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                      HRG 05-14-19 to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                                                        $150 Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                              CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                    HRG 06/25/19 from 05/14/19 - ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                      HRG 06/25/19 from 05/14/19 - OF MACY MONSON IN; SUPPORT OF MTN; TO COMPEL ARBITRATION & STAY; ACTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        HRG 06/25/19 from 05/14/19 - OF RODNEY B.; SORENSEN IN SUPPORT OF; MTN TO COMPEL; ARBITRATION & STAY ACTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                          HRG 06/25/19 from 05/14/19 - OF NICOLE WHITE IN; SUPPORT OF MTN; TO COMPEL ARBITRATION & STAY; ACTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            HRG 05/14/19 - IN SUPPORT OF; MTN TO COMPEL; ARBITRATION & STAY ACTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                to extend time for defs to respond to complaint - GRANTED until 3-19-19 - signed by Judge Kulkarni
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Clerk Rejection LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  #02632947 - Stipulation and order was signed by Judge Kulkarni on 3-15-19.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Court Orders the Answer or other Response to the Complaint for Def is due in March 5, 2019 by Judge Kalkarni
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint: The Court hereby ORDERS the Answer or other responses to the Complaint for Defendant is due on January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Stoelker, D13; See Order for Details; faxed 1/2/19rb
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              HRG - 12/18/2018 - Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                to extend time for def to respond *PENDING ** (sent to D13 Calendar Judge queue 11-30-18)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint/Civil Case Cover Sheet/ADR Information Sheet/Civil Lawsuit Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 439 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?