Rangel-Lopez v. League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kansas District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-02572-DDC-TJJ
District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 30, 2019 at 9:33 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark P. Johnson +81646024 00e xt24502 +1 816 531 7545 mark.johnson@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union of Kansas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Bonds +1 913 490 4114 lbonds@aclukansas.org
Space Zal Kotval Shroff +1 316 636 7303 zshroff@aclukansas.org
No Logo League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union of Kansas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Bonds +1 913 490 4114 lbonds@aclukansas.org
Space Zal Kotval Shroff +1 316 636 7303 zshroff@aclukansas.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark P. Johnson +81646024 00e xt24502 +1 816 531 7545 mark.johnson@dentons.com
v.
No Logo Ford County, Kansas, Clerk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinkle Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell Lee Herren +1 316 267 2000 +1 316 264 1556 mherren@hinklaw.com
Space Jeffrey Kuhlman +1 316 267 2000 jkuhlman@hinklaw.com
Space Bradley Joseph Schlozman +1 316 660 6296 +1 316 660 6596 bschlozman@hinklaw.com
Office Kansas City
Filed 10/26/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Allen
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Supplement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [4] Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/01/2018. (mig)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: MOTION HEARING held on 11/1/2018 re [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City filed by League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (Attachments: # (1) Witness Sheet, # (2) Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, # (3) Defendant's Exhibit List) (mig)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, Interested Party United States of America re: [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City (Bonds, Lauren)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Response to motion
                                        RESPONSE by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, Interested Party United States of America re [13] MOTION to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and for Accelerated Consideration of This Motion (Bonds, Lauren)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Response to motion
                                          RESPONSE by Defendant Ford County, Kansas, Clerk re [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Schlozman, Bradley)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Hearing. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING The court will hold an in-person hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. [4]) on 11/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in Topeka Courtroom 403 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. In setting the place of the hearing, the court has considered defendant Deborah Cox's request to hold the hearing in Wichita. Balancing the defendant's travel burdens against the court's need to accommodate its existing responsibilities to its criminal docket in Kansas City on Thursday afternoon, the court concludes that Topeka feasibly balances the interests affecting the hearing's location. The court thus sets the hearing in Topeka, Kansas. This interim determination does not nullify or decide any other aspects of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and Accelerated Consideration of this Motion (Doc. 13). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig) 18 Filed & Entered: 10/30/2018 Response to Motion RESPONSE by Defendant Ford County, Kansas, Clerk re [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Schlozman, Bradley) 19 Filed & Entered: 10/30/2018 Response to Motion RESPONSE by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, Interested Party United States of America re [13] MOTION to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and for Accelerated Consideration of This Motion (Bonds, Lauren) 20 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2018 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, Interested Party United States of America re: [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City (Bonds, Lauren) 21 Filed & Entered: 11/01/2018 Order on Motion for TRO MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: MOTION HEARING held on 11/1/2018 re [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City filed by League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (Attachments: # (1) Witness Sheet, # (2) Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, # (3) Defendant's Exhibit List) (mig) 22 Filed & Entered: 11/01/2018 Order on Motion for TRO MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [4] Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/01/2018. (mig)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice - other
                                              NOTICE of United States Attorney's Intent to Observe Dodge City, Kansas, Voting Polling Places on November 6, 2018 by United States of America (Allman, Christopher)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/29/2018. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (mig)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [13] MOTION to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and for Accelerated Consideration of This Motion by Defendant Ford County, Kansas, Clerk(Schlozman, Bradley)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Motion to transfer case
                                                    MOTION to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and for Accelerated Consideration of This Motion by Defendant Ford County, Kansas, Clerk (Schlozman, Bradley)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Kuhlman on behalf of Ford County, Kansas, Clerk (Kuhlman, Jeffrey)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell L. Herren on behalf of Ford County, Kansas, Clerk (Herren, Mitchell)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Joseph Schlozman on behalf of Ford County, Kansas, Clerk (Schlozman, Bradley)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 03:30 PM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 8354715 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. (mig) 10 Filed & Entered: 10/29/2018 Entry of Appearance ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Joseph Schlozman on behalf of Ford County, Kansas, Clerk (Schlozman, Bradley) 11 Filed & Entered: 10/29/2018 Entry of Appearance ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell L. Herren on behalf of Ford County, Kansas, Clerk (Herren, Mitchell) 12 Filed & Entered: 10/29/2018 Entry of Appearance ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Kuhlman on behalf of Ford County, Kansas, Clerk (Kuhlman, Jeffrey) 13 Filed & Entered: 10/29/2018 Motion to Transfer Case MOTION to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and for Accelerated Consideration of This Motion by Defendant Ford County, Kansas, Clerk (Schlozman, Bradley) 14 Filed & Entered: 10/29/2018 Memorandum in Support of Motion MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [13] MOTION to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and for Accelerated Consideration of This Motion by Defendant Ford County, Kansas, Clerk(Schlozman, Bradley) 15 Filed & Entered: 10/29/2018 Telephone Conference MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/29/2018. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (mig) 16 Filed & Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice (Other) NOTICE of United States Attorney's Intent to Observe Dodge City, Kansas, Voting Polling Places on November 6, 2018 by United States of America (Allman, Christopher) 17 Filed & Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Hearing. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING The court will hold an in-person hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. [4]) on 11/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in Topeka Courtroom 403 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. In setting the place of the hearing, the court has considered defendant Deborah Cox's request to hold the hearing in Wichita. Balancing the defendant's travel burdens against the court's need to accommodate its existing responsibilities to its criminal docket in Kansas City on Thursday afternoon, the court concludes that Topeka feasibly balances the interests affecting the hearing's location. The court thus sets the hearing in Topeka, Kansas. This interim determination does not nullify or decide any other aspects of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and Accelerated Consideration of this Motion (Doc. 13). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig) 18 Filed & Entered: 10/30/2018 Response to Motion RESPONSE by Defendant Ford County, Kansas, Clerk re [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Schlozman, Bradley) 19 Filed & Entered: 10/30/2018 Response to Motion RESPONSE by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, Interested Party United States of America re [13] MOTION to Transfer Case to the Wichita Division and for Accelerated Consideration of This Motion (Bonds, Lauren) 20 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2018 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, Interested Party United States of America re: [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City (Bonds, Lauren) 21 Filed & Entered: 11/01/2018 Order on Motion for TRO MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: MOTION HEARING held on 11/1/2018 re [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City filed by League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (Attachments: # (1) Witness Sheet, # (2) Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, # (3) Defendant's Exhibit List) (mig) 22 Filed & Entered: 11/01/2018 Order on Motion for TRO MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [4] Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/01/2018. (mig)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark P. Johnson on behalf of League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Summons issued
                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ford County, Kansas, Clerk. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Summons issued
                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ford County, Kansas, Clerk. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Motions No Longer Referred
                                                                    MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (mn)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/28/2018, Entered: 10/28/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford County, Kansas, Clerk, filed by Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas.(Bonds, Lauren)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Order of recusalCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W Lungstrum on 10/26/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N)(Shroff, Zal)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018, Terminated: 11/1/2018 Motion for TRO
                                                                            MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to reopen a polling location in Dodge City by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez (Shroff, Zal)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Designation of Place of Trial
                                                                              DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Shroff, Zal)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas, Alejandro Rangel-Lopez. (Shroff, Zal)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Complaint (Attorney)
                                                                                  COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4618004.), filed by Alejandro Rangel-Lopez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Kansas.(Shroff, Zal)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?