District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Ohio Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit United States Supreme Court

A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al v. Jon Husted
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 18-3984

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 27, 2018 at 2:35 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo A. Philip Randolph Institute, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Bonham +1 216 472 2220
Space Brenda Wright +1 617 232 5885

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Freda J Levenson +1 216 472 2220 +1 513 472 2210 flevenson@acluohio.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
Space Chiraag Bains +1 202 864 2746 +1 202 514 8336 cbains@demos.org
Space Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org
No Logo Larry Harmon, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Bonham +1 216 472 2220
Space Brenda Wright +1 617 232 5885

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Freda J Levenson +1 216 472 2220 +1 513 472 2210 flevenson@acluohio.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
Space Chiraag Bains +1 202 864 2746 +1 202 514 8336 cbains@demos.org
Space Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org
No Logo Northeast Ohio Coalition For The Homeless, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Bonham +1 216 472 2220
Space Brenda Wright +1 617 232 5885

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Freda J Levenson +1 216 472 2220 +1 513 472 2210 flevenson@acluohio.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
Space Chiraag Bains +1 202 864 2746 +1 202 514 8336 cbains@demos.org
Space Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org
No Logo Jon Husted, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather L. Buchanan +1 614 466 2872 +1 614 728 7592 heather.buchanan@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
Space Steven T. Voigt +1 614 466 2872
No Logo Judicial Watch, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Joseph Orfanedes +1 202 646 5171
No Logo Public Interest Legal Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Adrian Vanderhulst +1 317 203 5599
Nature of Suit 3441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:16-cv-00303
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:16-cv-00303
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013546865 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY filed by Mr. Stuart C. Naifeh for A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless regarding Reply to Appellee's Response to Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal Certificate of Service: 10/19/2018. [18-3984] (SCN)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013546630 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    AMICUS BRIEF filed by Paul J. Orfanedes for Judicial Watch, Inc. , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:10/19/2018. [18-3984] (PJO)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013546263 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae Public Interest Legal Foundation by Joseph A Vanderhulst. Certificate of Service: 10/19/2018. [18-3984] (JAV)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AMICUS BRIEF filed by Paul J. Orfanedes for Amicus Curiae Judicial Watch, Inc., with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:10/19/2018. [18-3984] THIS BRIEF IS LOCKED, SEE BRIEF FILED @3:12. NEW BRIEF WAS FILED TO INCLUDE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (PJO)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013546158 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Judicial Watch, Inc. by Paul J. Orfanedes. Certificate of Service: 10/19/2018. [18-3984] (PJO)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013546103 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [12]; previously filed by Mr. Stuart C. Naifeh for A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless and Larry Harmon. Response from Attorney Mr. Steven T. Voigt for Appellee Jon Husted Certificate of Service:10/19/2018. [18-3984] (STV)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013545805 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AMICUS BRIEF filed by Joseph A. Vanderhulst on behalf of Public Interest Legal Foundation, Inc., with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:10/18/2018. [18-3984] (JAV)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013543185 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER filed: Upon consideration, the Court directs that any response to the emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal, [12], be filed no later than 12:00 noon, Friday, October 19, 2018. Entered by order of the court. (LTK)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013542308 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPEARANCE filed for Appellants A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless by Elizabeth Bonham. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2018. [18-3984] (EB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013542289 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPEARANCE filed for Appellants A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless by Freda Levenson. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2018. [18-3984] (FL)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013542025 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Mr. Stuart C. Naifeh for A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless for injunction pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984]--[Edited 10/16/2018 by LTK] (SCN)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013542019 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stuart C. Naifeh for Appellants A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Certificate of Service:10/15/2018. [18-3984] (SCN)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013541463 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stuart C. Naifeh for Appellant Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984]--[Edited 10/15/2018 by LTK] (SCN)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013541460 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stuart C. Naifeh for Appellant A. Philip Randolph Institute. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984]--[Edited 10/15/2018 by LTK] (SCN)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013541423 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPEARANCE filed for Appellants A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless by Naila Awan. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984] (NSA)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013541405 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Jon Husted by Heather L. Buchanan. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984] (HLB)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013541402 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Jon Husted by Steven T. Voigt. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984] (STV)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013541389 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    APPEARANCE filed for Appellants A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless by Brenda Wright. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984] (BW)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013541382 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPEARANCE filed for Appellants A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless by Chiraag Bains. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984] (CB)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013541359 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        APPEARANCE filed for Appellants A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless by Stuart Naifeh. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2018. [18-3984] (SCN)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          The case manager for this case is: Leon Korotko. (LTK)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013539766 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon and Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Transcript needed: y. (LTK)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?