Weintraub v. Musk
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01669-CFC
District Judge Colm F. Connolly, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 1, 2021 at 2:54 PM EST (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ross Weintraub, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rigrodsky & Long PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D Long +1 302 295 5310 +1 302 654 7530 bdl@rl-legal.com
Space Seth D. Rigrodsky +1 302 295 5310 +1 302 654 7530 sdr@rigrodskylong.com
Space Gina Marie Serra +1 302 295 5310 +1 302 654 7530 GMS@rl-legal.com
v.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Antonio J. Gracias"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Officially listed as "Brad W. Buss"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
Officer/Director, Advance Auto Parts Inc
Officer/Director, Cavium Networks
Officer/Director, Aecom Technology Corp
Officer/Director, Ramtron International Corp
Officer/Director, TuSimple Holdings Inc.
Marvell Technology, Inc. Officer/Director, Marvell Technology, Inc.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Ehrenpreis, Ira Matthew Ehrenpreis, Ira Matthew, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ira Ehrenpreis"
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Murdoch, James R. Murdoch, James R., Defendant
Officially listed as "James Murdoch"
News Corporation Officer/Director, News Corporation
Officer/Director, Sotheby's Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, New Newscorp LLC
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kimbal Musk"
Officer/Director, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Officer/Director, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
No Logo Rice, Linda Johnson, Defendant
Officially listed as "Linda Johnson Rice"
Officer/Director, Bausch & Lomb, Inc.
Officer/Director, Omnicom Group Inc.
Officer/Director, Kimberly Clark Corp
Officer/Director, Dial Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Grubhub Seamless Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Enova International, Inc.
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robyn M. Denholm"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Officer/Director, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Juniper Networks, Inc. Officer/Director, Juniper Networks, Inc.
Officer/Director, Echelon Corp
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Steve Jurvetson"
Officer/Director, Athenahealth, Inc.
Officer/Director, Draper Associates, LP
Officer/Director, Draper Associates, Inc.
Officer/Director, Draper Timothy C
Officer/Director, Fisher John H N
Officer/Director, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Nominal Defendant
Office Wilmington
Filed 10/25/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County New Castle
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
117-cv-00317-MN
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019, Terminated: 4/25/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. McKenna - filed by Melvyn Klein. (Ernst, Ryan)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  SO ORDERED
    SO ORDERED, re [16] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. McKenna filed by Melvyn Klein. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/25/2019. (fms)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 SO ORDEREDCourt Filing
      SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:19-cv-00298-CFC) (14 in 1:18-cv-01669-CFC) Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation and Stay of Proceedings filed by Stephen Jurvetson, Tesla, Inc., James Murdoch, Brad Buss, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonia Gracias, Robyn Denholm. The Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action shall be captioned In re Tesla, Inc.Shareholder Derivative Litigation, Case No. 18-cv-01669-CFC. All documents or pleadings filed in the Consolidated Derivative Action shall include the caption of the consolidated case, be served on all parties within such cases, and be filed only in the lead case, 18-cv-1669-CFC. Case stayed. See stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01669-CFC, 1:19-cv-00298-CFC(fms)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Remark
        ALL DOCUMENTS OR PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE, 18-cv-1669-CFC. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01669-CFC, 1:19-cv-00298-CFC(fms)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Blank  Remark
          ALL DOCUMENTS OR PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE, 18-cv-1669-CFC. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01669-CFC, 1:19-cv-00298-CFC(fms)
            LREF
            Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/1/2021, Entered: None Suggestion of Death
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 stipulation
              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: Consolidation and Stay of Proceedings by Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Linda Johnson Rice, Steve Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  SO ORDERED
                  SO ORDERED, re [13] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Beth A. Keller filed by Ross Weintraub. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/8/2019. (fms)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019, Terminated: 1/8/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Beth A. Keller - filed by Ross Weintraub. (Long, Brian)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Notice of change of address
                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian D. Long (Long, Brian)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  SO ORDERED
                          SO ORDERED, re [8] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory F. Laufer, [11] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer C. Bretan of Fenwick & West LLP, [10] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dean Kristy of Fenwick & West LLP, [7] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Kramer. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2018. (nmf)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                            Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-CFC, 1:17-cv-00461-CFC, 1:18-cv-01669-CFC (rjb)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018, Terminated: 12/27/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer C. Bretan of Fenwick & West LLP - filed by Elon Musk. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018, Terminated: 12/27/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dean Kristy of Fenwick & West LLP - filed by Elon Musk. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 stipulation
                                  STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Regarding Service of Complaint and Stay of Proceedings by Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Linda Johnson Rice, Steve Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018, Terminated: 12/27/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory F. Laufer - filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Linda Johnson Rice, Steve Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018, Terminated: 12/27/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Kramer - filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Linda Johnson Rice, Steve Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Disclosure Statement
                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina M. Hendershot on behalf of Elon Musk (Hendershot, Sabrina)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alan Mason on behalf of Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Linda Johnson Rice, Steve Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Mason, Daniel)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Stachel on behalf of Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Linda Johnson Rice, Steve Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Stachel, Matthew)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                                                  Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Complaint
                                                    VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Linda Johnson Rice, Steve Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2489529.) - filed by Ross Weintraub. (Attachments: # (1) Certification, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  No Summons Issued
                                                      No Summons Issued. (ceg)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 385 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?