VA SOFTWARE v. SPEEDERA NETWORKS

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2002-1-CV-804959
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 28, 2018 at 9:42 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo SPEEDERA NETWORKS, INC., Defendant/Cross Complainant
No Logo Va Software Corporation, Plaintiff/Cross Defendant
Attributes
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; FENWICK & WEST LLP; LISI, DAVID M.; SILICON VALLEY CENTER; 801 CALIFORNIA STREET; MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94041-200; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ASSOC:; VA LINUX SYSTEMS INC.; SEIRMARCO, JAMES J.; 47071 BAYSIDE PARKWAY; FREMONT, CA 94538; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; GCA LAW PARTNERS LLP - MOUNTAIN VIEW; JACOBS, JAMES L.; 1891 LANDINGS DRIVE; MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94043; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Not Active
Case data converted on 06/28/2003; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None Request Dismissal
REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION; WITH PREJUDICE BY J. JACOBS & D. BARTELS; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
* CMCQ FILED ON 5/30/02; BY: J. JACOBS 5H STIP TO MEDIATION; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Decision
NTC: MEDIATION STATUS REVIEW; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None stipulation
STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION & EXTENSION OF TIME; (D BARTELS); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
PROOF OF SERV/REGULAR MAIL ANSWER OF PLT'S &; X-DEFT TO X-COMPL BY MAIL (ATTY: JACOBA); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
ANSWER OF PLTF & X-DEFT VA SOFTWARE CORP TO X-; COMPL OF SPEEDERA NETWORKS INC (ATTY: JACOBS); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None other
X-COMPLT OF SPEEDERA NETWORKS INC AGAINST VA; SOFTWARE CORPORATION, NO SUMMS (LISI); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None Response - Other than Dissolution, 1st Paper Filing
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY SPEEDERA NETWORKS INC; (ATTY LISI); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
SUMMONS RET/FILED W/PRF OF SVC ON DEF SPEEDERA; NETWORKS (PERSONAL) ON 1/31/02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED; CIVIL COVER; SHEET FILED (ATTY JACOBS); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?