VA SOFTWARE v. BORDEAUX-MATHILDA

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2002-1-CV-807191
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 28, 2018 at 10:40 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Bevocal, Inc., Cross Defendant
No Logo Bordeaux-Mathilda Partners Llc, Defendant/Cross Complainant
No Logo California Bavarian Corporation, Defendant/Cross Complainant
No Logo Mordell, Mark, Defendant/Cross Complainant
No Logo Va Software Corporation, Plaintiff/Cross Defendant
Attributes
Case Type Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 132 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Ntc: Entry of Dismissal and POS; Decision = M; Closed = 08/12/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 131 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None Request Dismissal
by waranoff/mayhew; Legacy Name = Request Dismissal Entire Action/W Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 08/05/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 130 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte
re ext of hrng date for va; softwares & bevocals mtns for; summ adjudication by hon manoukian; Legacy Name = x-parte stipulation and order; Decision = M; Closed = 07/30/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 129 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; SHARTSIS FRIESE & GINSBURG; HESPENHEIDE, AMY L.; ONE MARITIME PLAZA, 18TH FLOOR; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94111; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 128 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; FARELLA BRAUN & MARTEL LLP; WON, GRACE K.; 235 MONTGOMERY ST., 30TH FL.; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 127 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; FARELLA BRAUN & MARTEL LLP; WON, GRACE K.; 235 MONTGOMERY ST., 30TH FL.; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 126 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; FARELLA BRAUN & MARTEL LLP; WON, GRACE K.; 235 MONTGOMERY ST., 30TH FL.; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 125 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE & MALLORY - SF; WARANOFF, NICHOLAS B.; 333 BUSH ST. SUITE 1700; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 124 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Not Active
Case data converted on 06/28/2003; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 123 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None other
SEPARATE STMT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 122 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Declaration
DECL OF GRACE K WON IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUDICATION (WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 121 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Declaration
DECL OF EDWARD E CHERRY IN SUPPORT OF MTN; (WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 120 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Declaration
DECL OF MARK MORDELL IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR; SUMM ADJUDICATION (WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 119 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMM; JMT (WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 118 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
MTN FOR SUMMARY JMT/SUMM ADJUDICATION BY DEFT; (WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 117 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None Decision
NTC: JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 116 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
ANSWER OF BEVOCAL INC. TO 2MD AMENDED X-COMPL; (ATTY SCHABERG); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 115 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
ANS BY VA SOFTWARE CORP TO X-COMP OF BORDEAUX; MATHILDA PARTNERS 2ND AMENDED X-COMP(GOLD); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 114 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None Notice
NTC OF ENTRY OF STIP &ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO; FILE 2ND AMEND XCOM (ATTY WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 113 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None other
...NICHOLAS B. WARANOFF ESQ/GRACE J. WON XCTD; ON 05 21 03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 112 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
PRF OF SVC BY DELIVERY BY MESSENGER OF SEPERATE; STAMNT IN SUPP OF MTN FOR SUMM/JMNT AS TO....; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 111 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None other
...NICHOLAS B. WARANOFF ESQ/GRACE J. WON XCTD; ON 0521 03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 110 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
PRF OF SVC BY DELIVERY BY MESSENGER OF BEVOCAL; INC'S NTC OF MTN FOR SUMM/ADJ AS TO ....; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 109 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None other
...FOR SUMM/ADJ AS TO NICHOLAS B. WARANOF ESQ/; GRACE J. WON EXECUTED ON 05 21 03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 108 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
PRF OF SVC BY DELIVERY BY MESSENGER SVC OF; BEVOCAL INC.'S JOINDER IN VA SOFTWARE'S MTN..; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 107 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None other
...AGST VA SOFTWARE CORP AND BEVOCAL INC; (WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 106 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None other
X-COMP OF BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS LLC,; MARK MORDELL, CALIFORNIA BAVARIAN CORP...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 105 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None stipulation
STIP & ORDER GRANTING BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNER; LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED XCOMPLT (MAYHEW); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 104 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None other
...E. SCHABERG ESQ. BY PERSNL SVC EXECUTED ON; 05 22 03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 103 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None Supplemental
SUPPLEMENTAL PRF OF SVC OF NTC OF MTN FOR SUMM/; ADJDCTN AS TO GRACE K. WON ESQ. & ROBERT ...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 102 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None other
EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMM ADJ; (ATTY WARANOFF); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 101 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPP OF MTN FOR; SUMM AJD (ATTY WARANOFF); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 100 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None statement
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPP; OF MTN FOR SUMM ADJ (ATTY WARANOFF); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 99 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR; SUMMARY ADJ (ATTY WARANOFF); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 98 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
NTC OF MTN FOR SUMM ADJ TO OBTAIN CONSENT TO; THE SUBLEASE TERMINATION (WARANOFF)8-7-03 9AM; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 97 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None statement
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS; IN SUPPT OF VA SOFTWARE'S MTN(J ZELDIN)8/7/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 96 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None other
...(ATTY J ZELDIN) 8-7-03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 95 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None other
JOINDER OF BEVOCAL INC IN VA SOFTWARE'S MEMO OF; P'S & A'S IN SUPPT OF MTN FOR SUMM ADJ.......; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 94 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None other
...MATHILDA PARTNERS LLC'S CONSENT TO THE; SUBLEASE TERMINATION AGAREEMENT(ZELDIN)8/7/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 93 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
NTC OF MTN FUR SUMM ADJUDICATION OF BEVOCAL INC; THAT IT HAD NO DUTY TO OBTAIN BORDEAUX-......; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 92 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Decision
NTC: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; CONT. FROM 4-29-03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 91 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None Order
ORDER RE MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF VA; SOFTWARE/BEVOCAL/BORDEAUX BY JUDGE MANOUKIAN; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 90 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None other
..1ST AMENDED COMPLT (ATTY GERKING); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 89 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
ANSWER OF BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS LLC, MARK; MORDELL & CALIFORNIA BAVARIAN CORP TO..; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 88 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None Notice
NTC OF ELECTION TO STAND ON 1ST AMND COMPL; (ATTY WARNOFF); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 87 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None other
...MORDELL & CALIFORNIA BAVARIAN CORP. TO PLTFF; & X-DEFT VA SOFTWARE'S 1ST AMND COMPL(GERKING; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 86 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None Notice
NTC OF RULING ON DEMRR FILED BY DEFT & X-COMPL; BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS & DEFTS MARK ...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 85 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None other
....MANOUKIAN; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 84 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Order
ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO 1ST AMDD COMPLT (REFER TO; ORDER FOR RULING ON NUMEROUS CAUSES/JUDGE....; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 83 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Decision
NTC: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; AFTER MEDIATION; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 82 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
PROOF/PERSONAL SVC OF APPENDIX & REPLY AS TO; N. WARANOFF & R. SCHABERG, ON 3-14-03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 81 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None Response/Reply
REPLY OF DEFTS IN SUP OF DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDE; CMPLT, T. MAYHEW; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 80 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None other
APPENDIX OF NON-CALIF AUTH IN SUP OF REPLY FOR; DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLT, T. MAYHEW; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 79 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None other
APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPP; OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (N. WARANOFF) 3/20; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 78 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY VA SOFTWARE CORP; (N. WARANOFF) 3/20/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 77 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTY FOR VA SODTWARE; OLD: JAMES MILLER NEW: NICHOLAS WARANOFF; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 76 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Decision
NTC: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; AFTER MEDIATION; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 75 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Response/Reply
REPLY BRIEF OF BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS ISO; OF ITS MTN FOR SUMM JMT (WON) 1/30/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 74 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Response/Reply
REPLY DECL OF NICHOLAS WARANOFF IN SUPPT OF; SUMM ADJUDICATION (ATTY WARANOFF) 1-30-03 D7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 73 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Response/Reply
REPLY MEMO IN SUPPT OF MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUDICATION (ATTY WARANOFF) 1-30-03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 72 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
PRF OF SVC DEMURRER SERVED 1/17/03; (ATTY WON) 3/20/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 71 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPPT OF DEMURRER; (ATTY WON) 3/20/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 70 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None Notice of hearing
NTC OF DEMURRER & DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED; COMPLT (ATTY WON) 3/20/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 69 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
1ST PAPER OF MARK MORDELL & CALIFORNIA BAVARIAN; CORP A(TTY WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 68 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None Declaration
DECL OF THOMAS B MAYHEW IN SUPPT OF OPPOS TO; VA'S MTN FOR SUMM ADJUD (ATTY T MAYHEW)1-30-3; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 67 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None Response/Reply
RESPONSE OF BORDEUX MATHILDA TO BEVOCAL'S SEP; STMT & STMT OF ADDL FACTS(ATTY MAYHEW)1-30-03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 66 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
OPPOS OF BORDEUX-MATHILDA TO VA SOFTWARES MTN; FOR SUMM ADJUD(ATTY T MAYHEW)1-30-03 D7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Response/Reply
RESPONSE OF BORDEUX-MATHILDA TO VA SOFTWARES; SEP STMT OF ADL MATL FACTS(ATTY MAYHEW)1-30; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 64 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Declaration
DECL OF JANET YOUNG IN SUPP OF BORDEUX MATHILDA; PARTNERS OPPOS TO MTNS FOR SUMM ADJUD(MAYHEW); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 63 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
OPPOS BY BORDEUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS TO BEVOCALS'; MTN FOR SUMM ADJUD(ATTY T MAYHEW) 1-30-03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 62 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY PLTF IN SUPP OF; OPPOS TO DEFS MTN FOR SUM ADJUD(S BANAGOFSKY); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 61 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None other
EVIDENCE OF PLTF IN OPPOS TO DEFS MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUD (ATTY BANAGOFSKY) 1-30-03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 60 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Declaration
DECL OF GARTH E PICKETT IN OPPOS TO DEFS MTN; FOR SUMM ADJUD (ATTY BANAGOFSKY)1-30-03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 59 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
OPPOSING SEPARATE STMT OF PLTFF IN OPPOS TO; DEF'S MTN FOR SUMM ADJUD(ATTY S BANAGOFSKY); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 58 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
OPPOS BY PLTFF TO DEFS MTN FOR SUMM ADJUD; (ATTY S BANAGOFSKY) 1-30-03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 57 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Declaration
DECL OF KATHLEEN MCELWEE IN OPPOS TO MTN FOR; SUMM ADJDCTN (ATTY WARANOFF) 1/30/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 56 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
PROOF OF SERV/REGULAR MAIL MTN FOR SUMM. ADJ.; ON 12/30/02 (ATTH SCHABERG); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 55 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None statement
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPT. OF MTN; FOR SUMM. ADJ. (ATTY SCHABERG) 1/30/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 54 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
NTC OF MTN & MTN FOR SUMM ADJUDICATION; (ATTY SCHABERG) 1/30/03 DEPT 4; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 53 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
PRF OF SVC MTN FOR SUMM ADJUDICATION SERVED; 12/30/02 (ATTY WON) 1/30/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 52 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Declaration in Support
DECL OF MARK MORDELL IN SUPPT OF MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUDICATION (ATTY WON) 1/30/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 51 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Declaration in Support
DECL OF GRACE WON IN SUPPT OF MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUDICATION (ATTY WON) 1/30/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 50 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None statement
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPT OF MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUDICATION (ATTY WON) 1/30/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 49 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPPT OF MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUDICATION (ATTY WON) 1/30/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 48 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
NTC OF MTN & MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; (ATTY WON) 1/30/03 DEPT 7; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 47 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: None other
1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & DECLATORY; RELIEF (WARANOFF); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 46 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: None Notice
NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE; 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (ATTY WARANOFF); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 45 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
P.O.S. REG MAIL OF NTC OF MTN FOR SUMM ADJUD; AS TO GRACE WON, ROBERT SCHABERG 12/23/02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 44 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPRT OF MTN FOR; SUMM ADJUDICATION (ATTY WARANOFF) 1/30/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 43 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None statement
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPRT OF MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUDICATION 1/30/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 42 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None Declaration
DECL OF KATHLEEN MCELWEE IN SUPRT OF MTN FOR; SUMM ADJUDICATION 1/30/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 41 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPRT OF MTN FOR SUMM; ADJUDICATION (ATTY WARANOFF) 14/30/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 40 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
NTC OF MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; (ATTY WARANOFF) 1/30/03; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 39 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None Order
ORDER GRANTING VA SOFTWARE'S MTN FOR LEAVE TO; FILE 1ST AMND COMP SIGNED BY JAMIE JACOBS MAY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 38 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None Decision
NTC: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; AFTER MEDIATION; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 37 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
OPPOS OF BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS LLC STATE-; MENT OF NON-OPPOS TO MTN TO FILE 1ST AMD COMP; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 36 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
PRF OF SVC BY MAIL MTN TO FILE AMENDED COMPLT; SERVED 11/15/02 (ATTY WARANOFF) 12/12/02 D4; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 35 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None Declaration in Support
DECL OF NICHOLAS WARANOFF IN SUPPT OF MTN TO; FILE AMENDED COMPLT (ATTY WARANOFF) 12/12/02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 34 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPPT OF MTN TO FILE; AMENDED COMPLT (ATTY WARANOFF) 12/12/02 D4; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 33 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None Motion (Family)
NTC OF MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE 1ST AMENDED; COMPLT (ATTY WARANOFF) 12/12/02 DEPT 4; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None Judical Arbitration - Ordered
876 - STIP TO MEDIATION W/JUDGE RICHARD PATSEY; NOTICE OF STAY/MEDIATION FOR; 30 DAYS/T1; Decision = M; Closed = 08/29/2002
Request RequestSpace
Blank 31 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: None stipulation
STIP & ORDER TO MEDIATION/MSR PREV. SET FOR; 12-5-02 SIGNED HON. JACOBS-MAY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 30 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: None Notice
NTC OF ORDER TO ARB & STAY/RET. FOR MEDIATION; BY GRACE WON MEDIATOR: HON. R. PATSEY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: None Decision
NTC: MEDIATION STATUS REVIEW; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 28 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Decision
NTC: NOTICE OF STAY/MEDIATION FOR; 30 DAYS/T1; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 27 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None other
...CNSL FOR DEFT/XCOMPL BORDEAUX-MATHILDA; PARTNERS LLC & XDEFT BEVOCAL INC 8/2/02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
PRF OF SERV/REGULAR MAIL/FAX OF REPLY IN SUPPT; OF DEMUIRRER/MTN TO STRIKE/XCOMPL AS TO...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
* CMCQ FILED ON 8-5-02 STIP TO MED (10-D) 1; BY: SCOTT BONAGOFSKY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
* CMCQ FILED ON 8-01-02; BY: G. WON; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None Declaration
PLTF/CROSS-DEFT VA SOFTWARE CORP ANSWER TO DEFT; CROSS-COMPLAINANT 1ST AMENDED X-COMPLAINT; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: None other
AMENDED PRF OF SRV 1ST AMENDED X-COM FOR DAMAGE; AND DECL RELIEF (ATTY G.WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
PROOF OF SERV/X-COMPLAINT AS TO NICHOLAS B.; WARANOFF & ROBERT E SCHABERG (MAILED 8/2/2); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None other
...... A DELAWARE CORPORATION; BEVOCAL INC A; DELAWARE CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 10 [G K WON]; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None other
1ST AMENDED X-COMPLAINT BY BORDEAUX-MATHILDA; PARTNER AGNST: VA SOFTWARE CORPORATION ......; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None other
....(ATTYS: WARANOFF/GOLD/BONAGOFSKY); 08/08/02 9AM D4 JUDGE JACOBS-MAY; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None other
..PORTIONS OF DEFT/X-COMPLAINANT BORDEAUX-; MATHILDA PARTNERS' X-COMPLT ....; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None Response/Reply
REPLY BRIEF BY PLTFF VA SOFTWARE CORPORATION; IN SUPPT OF DEMURRER/MTN TO STRIKE ...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
OPPOSITION TO VA SOFTWARE'S DEMURRER & MTN TO; STRIKE, GRACE K. WON; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Response - Other than Dissolution, 1st Paper Filing
ANSWER OF BEVOCAL INC TO X-COMPLT OF; BORDEAUX-MATHILDA (ATTY HESPENHEIDE); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
PRF OF SVC BY MAIL & FAX MTN TO STRIKE &; DEMURRER SERVED 6/19/02 (ATTY BONAGOFSKY); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPPT OF MTN TO STRIKE; (ATTY BONAGOFSKY) 8/8/02 DEPT 4; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Demurrer
DEMURRER OF VA SOFTWARE TO X-COMPLT; (ATTY BONAGOFSKY) 8/8/02 DEPT 4; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Demurrer
NTC OF HRG ON DEMURRER OF VA SOFTWARE CORP; TO X-COMPLT (ATTY BONAGOFSKY) 8/8/02 DEPT 4; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None other
..(ATTY BONAGOFSKY) 8/8/02 DEPT 4; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Motion (Family)
NTC OF MTN & MTN TO STRIKE X-COMPLT OF; BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS LLC...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
SUMMONS RETURNED ON X-COMPLT OF BORDEAUZ; SERVED TO BEVOCAL INC 5/20/02 (ATTY WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None other
.... (ATTY WON); SUMMONS ISSUED; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None other
X-COMPLT OF BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS LLC AGST; VA SOFTWARE CORPORATION, & BEVOCAL INC ....; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None Response - Other than Dissolution, 1st Paper Filing
ANSWER BY DEFT BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS LLC; TO COMPLT (ATTY WON); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: None other
...ISSUE MEMO AS TO BORDEAUX-MATHILDA PARTNERS; LLC SERVED ON 04-19-02; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: None Proof of Service: Substituted
PRF OF SUBST SVC OF SUMMNS/COMPL/NTC TOLTGNTS/; ADR INFO SHEET/MEET & CONFER STMNT/CMCQ & ...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED; CIVIL COVER; SHEET FILED (ATTY. I. GOLD); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?