Doe v. The Trump Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-09936-LGS
District Judge Lorna G. Schofield, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 28, 2021 at 3:42 PM DT (2.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jane Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan & Company, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Charles Quinn +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 jquinn@kaplanandcompany.com
Space Alexander J Rodney +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 arodney@kaplanandcompany.com

Toggle Switch Represented by kaplanhecker.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Craig +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 mcraig@kaplanhecker.com
Space Roberta Ann Kaplan +1 212 763 0883 rkaplan@kaplanhecker.com
Space Joshua Adam Matz +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
No Logo Luke Loe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan & Company, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roberta Ann Kaplan +1 212 763 0883 rkaplan@kaplanhecker.com
Space Joshua Adam Matz +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
Space John Charles Quinn +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 jquinn@kaplanandcompany.com
Space Alexander J Rodney +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 arodney@kaplanandcompany.com

Toggle Switch Represented by kaplanhecker.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Craig +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 mcraig@kaplanhecker.com
No Logo Mary Moe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan & Company, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Craig +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 mcraig@kaplanhecker.com
Space Roberta Ann Kaplan +1 212 763 0883 rkaplan@kaplanhecker.com
Space Joshua Adam Matz +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
Space John Charles Quinn +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 jquinn@kaplanandcompany.com
Space Alexander J Rodney +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 arodney@kaplanandcompany.com
No Logo Richard Roe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan & Company, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Craig +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 mcraig@kaplanhecker.com
Space Roberta Ann Kaplan +1 212 763 0883 rkaplan@kaplanhecker.com
Space Joshua Adam Matz +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
Space John Charles Quinn +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 jquinn@kaplanandcompany.com
Space Alexander J Rodney +1 212 763 0883 +1 212 564 0883 arodney@kaplanandcompany.com
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump, Jr."
No Logo Trump, Eric, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric Trump"
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ivanka Trump"
No Logo The Trump Corporation, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/29/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (361) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order for Substitution of Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Request to proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [150] Letter Motion to Compel; granting [155] Letter Motion to Compel; denying [208] Letter Motion for Conference It is hereby: ORDERED that ACN's motion to compel arbitration of its discovery disputes with Plaintiff, or this action in its entirety, is DENIED. The Court will accept no further briefing on the issue of compelling arbitration. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to compel ACN to produce documents in response to Plaintiffs' subpoena duces tecum is GRANTED to the following extent: Plaintiffs and ACN shall meet and confer regarding (1) the scope of production, with the understanding that ACN must produce relevant documents consistent with the dictates of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26; and (2) to the extent necessary, the provisions of the confidentiality agreement pursuant to which the production will take place. The Court advises that documents and information requested by Plaintiffs to meet the standard for class certification under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 are currently discoverable, and that the appropriate time frame for production in response to any request may vary based on the request. Plaintiffs and ACN shall file a joint letter by April 24, 2020, not to exceed three pages, to apprise the Court of their progress in negotiations, ACN's estimated timeline for production and remaining disputes. It is further ORDERED that ACN's request for relief from the Court's Orders authorizing Plaintiffs to proceed under pseudonyms in this matter is DENIED to the extent that ACN seeks relief that is broader than the Court's direction to Plaintiffs and ACN to confer regarding the provisions of a protective order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to compel the MGM Entities to make available to Plaintiffs certain video footage is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall bear the reasonable costs of production, and the parties shall confer before incurring such costs. Plaintiffs shall file a letter by April 24, 2020, to apprise the Court of their discussions and agreements concerning production. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer on the issue of whether Plaintiffs should be able to continue to proceed anonymously and, if so, to what extent. The parties shall file a joint letter by April 24, 2020, not to exceed three pages, to apprise the Court of (1) the extent to which the parties have reached agreement; and (2) any remaining disputes and the factual and legal support for the parties' respective positions. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close the motions at Dkt. Nos. 150, 155 and 208. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/9/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [162] Letter Motion to Seal: ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to seal the letter at Dkt. No. 164 is GRANTED. The sealed document shall remain accessible only to the following parties and counsel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/9/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [227] Letter, filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs shall file a letter response by April 16, 2020. Non-party Ms. Butcher shall file a letter response by April 20, 2020. Ms. Butcher is directed to stay production pending further Court Order. Plaintiffs shall serve this Order and the letter at Dkt. No. 227 on Ms. Butcher, and file proof of such service, by April 13, 2020. The parties are advised that the Court may rule on the letters. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/9/2020) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 229 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION & ORDER re: [113] MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Ivanka Trump, Donald Trump, Jr., The Trump Corporation, Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion to compel arbitration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket No. 113. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/8/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [210] Letter Motion to Seal. WHEREAS, no letter was filed. It is hereby ORDERED that letter motion at Dkt. No. 210 is DENIED. See Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 120 (2d Cir. 2006) ("[D]ocuments may be sealed if specific, on the record findings are made demonstrating that closure is essential to preserve higher values and is narrowly tailored to serve that interest."). The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to unseal the document at Dkt. No. 212. (As further set forth in this Order.). (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/8/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephanie E. Niehaus dated April 8, 2020 re: Supplement to Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena and in Support of ACNs Cross-Motion to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC..(Niehaus, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan, Joanna C. Hendon, and Jessica Stebbins-Bina dated April 8, 2020 re: Call-In Number and Passcode for April 9, 2020 Telephonic Conference with Court. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan, Joanna C. Hendon, and Stephanie E. Niehaus dated April 8, 2020 re: Call-In Number and Passcode for April 9, 2020 Telephonic Conference with Court. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: 4/6/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [223] Response in Support of Motion, filed by Ivanka Trump, Donald Trump, Jr., The Trump Corporation, Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump. ENDORSEMENT: "The parties are advised that the mere existence of a confidentiality agreement covering judicial documents is insufficient to overcome the First Amendment presumption of access." Bowling v. Johnson & Johnson, No. 17 Civ. 3982, 2019 WL 1760162, at *8 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 22, 2019). Per the requirements of this Circuit, all prior orders granting motions to seal have been based on particularized justifications specific to the information sought to be sealed. See Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 120 (2d Cir. 2006) ("[D]ocuments may be sealed if specific, on the record findings are made demonstrating that closure is essential to preserve higher values and is narrowly tailored to serve that interest.") Although some of those justifications may apply to the redactions requested here, Defendants bear the burden to justify this request. The motion to seal at Dkt. No. 210 is preliminarily DENIED, but the Clerk of Court is directed to stay the unsealing pending future Court Order. If Defendants intend to file any additional letter in support of the motion to seal, they shall do so by April 7, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/6/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 Response in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated 04/03/2020 re: [210] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated March 27, 2020. . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump..(Kincaid, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: 4/2/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [211] LETTER MOTION for Conference re Proposed Motion to Compel Anne Archer Butcher and Dolphin Entertainment addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated March 27, 2020. filed by Richard Roe, Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants shall file any letter in support of Plaintiffs' motion to seal by April 3, 2020. (Responses due by 4/3/2020) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/2/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated April 1, 2020 re: Defendants' Letter-Motion for Reconsideration Dated March 25, 2020 (Doc. No. 208). Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [209] Letter Status Update filed by Richard Roe, Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request to extend fact discovery is GRANTED. An amended case management plan and scheduling order will issue separately. Plaintiffs shall file a letter response to Defendants' letter at Dkt. No. 208, pursuant to this Court's Individual Rules, by April 1, 2020. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/31/20) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [215] Letter filed by Richard Roe, Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe. ENDORSEMENT: The telephonic conference scheduled on April 1, 2020, at 3:00 pm., is CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/31/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated March 30, 2020 re: Response to Letters Filed by Non-Party ACN (Doc. Nos. 202 & 205). Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated March 30, 2020 re: Call-In Number and Passcode for April 1, 2020 Telephonic Conference with Court. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated March 30, 2020 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on [213] LETTER by Anne Archer Butcher, Dolphin Entertainment; denying as moot [211] Letter Motion for Conference ; denying as moot [212] Letter Motion for Conference. ENDORSEMENT: As the Non-Parties represent that they intend to produce the requested documents by April 30, 2020, Plaintiff's letter motion at Dkt. Nos. 211 & 212 is DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/30/2020) (tro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Deana Davidian dated March 30, 2020 re: Jane Doe, et al. v. The Trump Corp., et al., 18-cv-09936 (LGS). Document filed by Anne Archer Butcher, Dolphin Entertainment..(Davidian, Deana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020, Terminated: 3/30/2020 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Conference re Proposed Motion to Compel Anne Archer Butcher and Dolphin Entertainment addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated March 27, 2020. Document filed by Richard Roe, Luke Loe, Jane Doe, Mary Moe.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [210].(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020, Terminated: 3/30/2020 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Conference re Proposed Motion to Compel Anne Archer Butcher and Dolphin Entertainment addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated March 27, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020, Terminated: 4/8/2020 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated March 27, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated March 27, 2020 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: 3/25/2020, Terminated: 4/9/2020 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated 03/25/2020. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump..(Kincaid, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated March 20, 2020 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [205] Letter, filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: This Court's order at Dkt. No. 204 is vacated. Plaintiffs shall file a letter response to the letter at Dkt. No. 202 by March 30, 2020. The dispute will be discussed at the conference on April 9, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/17/2020) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephanie E. Niehaus dated March 17, 2020 re: request for clarification or reconsideration of the Court's March 16, 2020 Order allowing Plaintiffs six weeks until April 30, 2020 to respond to ACN's March 14, 2020 Letter Request. Document filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC..(Niehaus, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/16/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 3/17/2020, Doc. #206 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [202] Letter, filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs shall file a letter response by April 30, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/16/2020) (cf) Modified on 3/17/2020 (jca).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/16/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Adam Matz on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Matz, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/14/2020, Entered: 3/14/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephanie E. Niehaus dated March 14, 2020 re: request for limited, expedited relief from the Courts Orders authorizing Plaintiffs to proceed under pseudonyms in this matter. Document filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC..(Niehaus, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated March 13, 2020 re: Further Update on ACN's Efforts to Commence Arbitration. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on April 9, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. to discuss the motion. The MGM Entities shall appear. The Court will call the conference participants once the conference is ready to begin. The participants shall file a joint letter by April 8, 2020, providing the Court with one telephone call-in number for a conference call and, to the extent necessary, a passcode. The participants shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. (Telephone Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/13/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on April 9, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. to discuss the motion. Nonparty ACN Opportunity, LLC shall appear. The Court will call the conference participants once the conference is ready to begin. The participants shall file a joint letter by April 8, 2020, providing the Court with one telephone call-in number for a conference call and, to the extent necessary, a passcode. The participants shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. (Telephone Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/13/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER terminating [185] Letter Motion to Compel. As discussed at conference, it is hereby ORDERED that, by March 20, 2020, Defendants shall complete production of documents collected from the initial nine custodians. It is further ORDERED that the limitations placed on Electronic Discovery by this Court's Individual Rule II.A.1(a), (b) and (d) are WAIVED. Discovery of responsive ESI created as early as 2005 is allowed. It is further ORDERED that a telephonic status conference shall occur on April 1, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close the motion at Dkt. No. 185. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/13/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 3/12/2020. (Court Reporter Present) (jcs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated March 11, 2020 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated March 11, 2020 re: Call-In Number and Passcode for March 12, 2020 Telephonic Conference with Court. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Mark P. Henriques to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19053031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement NC Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Supplement Affidavit of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order).(Henriques, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the March 12, 2020, 11:15 a.m. conference is adjourned to March 12, 2020, at 3:20 p.m. The conference will remain telephonic. If the parties are not able to arrange a conference call, they shall contact the Courtroom Deputy, Mr. James Street, at 212-805-4553, as soon as possible and no later than March 11, 2020, at noon, to make other arrangements. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Telephone Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 03:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/9/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [195] MOTION for Mark P. Henriques to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19053031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated March 6, 2020 re: [185] LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Responsive Discovery and Requesting Relief from Certain Default Rules addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 28, 2020. . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump..(Kincaid, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [187] Letter Motion to Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the redaction requests are GRANTED. The redacted versions of the aforementioned documents that have been filed on ECF are sufficient; the unredacted documents shall remain under seal. The parties are advised that the Court retains discretion as to whether to afford confidential treatment to redacted information in Orders and Opinions. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close the letter motion at Dkt. No. 187. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/4/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [189] Letter filed by Richard Roe, Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are advised that the Court expects the parties to meet and confer in good faith and consent to revised deadlines per Section 8(h) of the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. For clarity, an amended Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order will be issued separately. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/4/2020) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated March 3, 2020 re: Deadlines Set Forth in the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Declaration in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Brian Edwards in Support re: [187] LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jessica Stebbins Bina dated March 3, 2020.. Document filed by JMBP, LLC, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc...(Stebbins Bina, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020, Terminated: 3/4/2020 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jessica Stebbins Bina dated March 3, 2020. Document filed by JMBP, LLC, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc...(Stebbins Bina, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER with respect to [185] LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Responsive Discovery and Requesting Relief from Certain Default Rules. Defendants shall file a letter response to Plaintiffs' letter by March 6, 2020. A telephonic conference will be held on March 12, 2020, at 11:15 a.m. The parties shall jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0288 from landline telephones at the appointed date and time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/2/2020) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: (Responses due by 3/6/2020), Set/Reset Hearings: (Telephone Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 11:15 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020, Terminated: 3/13/2020 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Responsive Discovery and Requesting Relief from Certain Default Rules addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 28, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage ., [154] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 7, 2020. . Document filed by Richard Roe, Luke Loe, Jane Doe, Mary Moe. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [154].(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [154] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 7, 2020., [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage . . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part [171] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application GRANTED IN PART. For substantially the reasons set forth in Plaintiffs' letter motion, the application is granted in part. The parties shall complete fact discovery by May 2, 2020. An amended Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order will issue separately. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/25/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 5/2/2020. (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [172] Letter Motion to Seal. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close the motion at Dkt. No. 172. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/24/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER with respect to [171] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendants shall file any opposition to Plaintiffs' request for an extension to discovery deadlines by February 27, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/24/2020) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 24, 2020 re: Defendants' Letter (Doc. No. 177). Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated February 24, 2020 re: Plaintiffs' Letter Motion dated February 21, 2020. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A).(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/27/2020 (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage . . Document filed by Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc., JMBP, LLC, Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe, The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- E-Mail dated July 7, 2009, # (2) Exhibit 3- Emails dated October 10, 2008, # (3) Exhibit 4- Press Release, # (4) Exhibit 6- Emails dated February 16, 2009 and February 18, 2009, # (5) Exhibit 7- Email Chain, # (6) Exhibit 8- Email Chain)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [172].(Stebbins Bina, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Brian Edwards in Opposition re: [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage .. Document filed by JMBP, LLC, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc...(Stebbins Bina, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jessica Stebbins Bina in Opposition re: [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage .. Document filed by JMBP, LLC, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-[REDACTED] E-Mail dated July 7, 2008, # (2) Exhibit 2- Email dated September 11, 2008, # (3) Exhibit 3- [REDACTED] Emails dated October 10, 2008, # (4) Exhibit 4-[REDACTED] Press Release, # (5) Exhibit 5- Emails Dated February 16, 2009 and February 18, 2009, # (6) Exhibit 6- [REDACTED] Email Chain, # (7) Exhibit 7- [REDACTED] Email Chain, # (8) Exhibit 8- [REDACTED] Email Chain, # (9) Exhibit 9- November 22, 2019 Letter).(Stebbins Bina, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage . [REDACTED]. Document filed by JMBP, LLC, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc...(Stebbins Bina, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020, Terminated: 2/24/2020 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jessica Stebbins Bina dated February 21, 2020. Document filed by JMBP, LLC, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc...(Stebbins Bina, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020, Terminated: 2/25/2020 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 21, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [150] MOTION to Compel NON-PARTY ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC to PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM . - AND IN OPPOSITION TO ACN'S CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Bourland, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephanie E. Niehaus dated February 18, 2020 re: the Court's Order of February 13, 2020 [ECF No. 165] requesting that ACN explain why portions of Plaintiffs February 11, 2020 letter should be redacted in the public record and sealed under Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondoga, 435 F. 3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006). Document filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC..(Niehaus, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [150] MOTION to Compel NON-PARTY ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC to PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM . and Cross-Motion to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by ACN Opportunity, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of David Merriman in Support of ACN Opportunity LLC's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and in Support of Cross-Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (2) Affidavit of Mark Henriques, Esq. in Support of ACN Opportunity LLC's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and in Support of Cross-Motion to Compel Arbitration).(Niehaus, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court's Order dated February 13, 2020, Concerning the Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Seal Document served on Stephanie E. Niehaus, Esq. on February 13, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Berman, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order Concerning Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Non-Party, ACN Opportunity, LLC, to Produce Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Stephanie E. Niehaus, Esq. on February 12, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Berman, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER with respect to [162] Letter Motion to Seal. ACN Opportunity, LLC shall, by February 18, 2020, file on ECF a letter providing an explanation as to why portions of the Letter should be sealed under Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006). Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on ACN Opportunity, LLC and file proof of service on ECF by February 14, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/13/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 11, 2020 re: Motion to Compel ACN Opportunity, LLC (re: 162 Letter Motion). Document filed by Richard Roe, Luke Loe, Jane Doe, Mary Moe.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [162].(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 11, 2020 re: Motion to Compel ACN Opportunity, LLC (re: 162 Letter Motion). Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020, Terminated: 4/9/2020 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John C. Quinn dated February 12, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Quinn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [162] Endorsed letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Court's Order dated February 10, 2020 (Doc. No. 160) served on Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc. and JMBP, LLC on February 10, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Rodney, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [154] Motion to Seal Document. Plaintiffs' application to seal is preliminarily GRANTED pending the MGM Entities' letter regarding Plaintiffs' sealing request. The MGM Entities shall file a consolidated letter by March 3, 2020, explaining to the Court why they seek to have any information included in Plaintiffs' motion to compel, the MGM Entities' opposition and Plaintiffs' reply redacted or sealed. If Plaintiffs' bear the burden of persuasion for any redaction or sealing requests, the letter shall be jointly filed by both parties. Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on the MGM Entities and file proof of service by February 12, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/10/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Declaration in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Alexander J. Rodney in Support re: [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage ., [154] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 7, 2020.. Document filed by Richard Roe, Luke Loe, Jane Doe, Mary Moe. (Attachments: # (1) EX. A, # (2) EX. B, # (3) EX. C, # (4) EX. D, # (5) EX. E, # (6) EX. F, # (7) EX. G, # (8) EX. H, # (9) EX. I, # (10) EX. J, # (11) EX. K, # (12) EX. L, # (13) EX. M, # (14) EX. N, # (15) EX. O)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [154].(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Declaration in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Alexander J. Rodney in Support re: [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage ., [154] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 7, 2020.. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) EX. A, # (2) EX. B, # (3) EX. C, # (4) EX. D, # (5) EX. E, # (6) EX. F, # (7) EX. G, # (8) EX. H, # (9) EX. I, # (10) EX. J, # (11) EX. K, # (12) EX. L, # (13) EX. M, # (14) EX. N, # (15) EX. O).(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage ., [154] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 7, 2020. . Document filed by Richard Roe, Luke Loe, Jane Doe, Mary Moe. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [154].(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [154] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 7, 2020., [155] MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage . . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020, Terminated: 4/9/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel the MGM Entities to Make Available a Limited Subset of Video Footage . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020, Terminated: 2/10/2020 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated February 7, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated February 3, 2020 re: Joint Proposed Schedule for Expert Disclosures. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [150] MOTION to Compel NON-PARTY ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC to PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM . . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Bourland, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of NICK BOURLAND in Support re: [150] MOTION to Compel NON-PARTY ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC to PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM .. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - PLAINTIFFS' SEPTEMBER 6, 2019 SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO ACN, # (2) Exhibit B - NON-PARTY ACN'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM, # (3) Exhibit C - NON-PARTY ACN'S PROPOSED REVISED NON-DISCLOSURE AGREEMENT).(Bourland, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020, Terminated: 4/9/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel NON-PARTY ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC to PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Bourland, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe..(Bourland, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated January 27, 2020 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Court's Order dated January 23, 2020 (Doc. No. 146) served on Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc. and JMBP, LLC on January 24, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Rodney, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: granting [129] Letter Motion for Conference. ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted leave to file the motion to compel, according to the following schedule: (1) the motion to compel, and accompanying memorandum of law, not to exceed ten pages, are due February 7, 2020; (2) the MGM Entities shall file an opposing memorandum of law, not to exceed ten pages, by February 21, 2020; and (3) Plaintiffs shall file the reply, not to exceed five pages, by February 28, 2020. Plaintiffs shall include as exhibits the at-issue subpoena and the MGM Entities' objections and responses to the subpoena. Except as provided in this Order, parties shall follow the Court's Individual Rules concerning motions, including on exhibits and courtesy copies. It is further ORDERED that, should the parties come to an agreement to transfer the motion to another District or otherwise on the motion, the parties shall file a letter with the Court by February 7, 2020, in lieu of the motion. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on the MGM Entities and file proof of service on ECF by January 27, 2020.The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 129. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2020) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/7/2020. Responses due by 2/21/2020 Replies due by 2/28/2020. (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 145 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [140] Motion for Jessica Stebbins Bina to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated January 10, 2020 re: the Court's Order dated January 7, 2020 (Doc. No. 141) Concerning Plaintiffs' Discovery Dispute with the MGM Entities. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of COURT ORDER OF JANUARY 7, 2020 served on ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC on January 8, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Bourland, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER terminating [131] Letter Motion for Conference. WHEREAS, on December 10, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a letter motion for a conference regarding a proposed motion to compel non-party ACN Opportunity, LLC to produce documents (Dkt. No. 131); WHEREAS, on January 6, 2020, non-party ACN Opportunity, LLC emailed a letter response to the Court, pursuant to this Courts Order (Dkt. No. 135). It is hereby ORDERED that, by January 17, 2020, Plaintiffs and non-party ACN Opportunity, LLC shall meet and confer to attempt to negotiate an agreement as to a scope of production. It is further ORDERED that, if there remain disputes as to the scope of production, Plaintiffs shall file a motion to compel the production of documents, which shall be subject to the following schedule: Plaintiffs shall file the motion to compel, and a memorandum of law not to exceed ten pages, by January 31, 2020; non-party ACN Opportunity, LLC shall file its memorandum of law in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion, not to exceed ten pages, by February 14, 2020; and Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion, not to exceed five pages, by February 21, 2020. Each party shall make clear their latest position on each issue following the negotiation. Plaintiffs shall include as exhibits the at-issue subpoena and non-party ACN Opportunity, LLC's objections and responses to the subpoena. The parties shall otherwise follow the Court's Individual Rules concerning motions, including those concerning exhibits and courtesy copies. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on non-party ACN Opportunity, LLC and file proof of service on ECF by January 9, 2020. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 131. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/7/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a letter on ECF by January 10, 2020, not to exceed three pages, providing the factual and legal support for this Court's jurisdiction over this discovery dispute, citing to the extent available binding precedent (i.e., 2d Circuit reported decisions) and if not available, then non-binding precedent. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/7/2020) (rj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/31/2020. Responses due by 2/14/2020 Replies due by 2/21/2020. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020, Terminated: 1/10/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Jessica Stebbins Bina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18431581. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc., JMBP, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Jessica Stebbins Bina in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Stebbins Bina, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [140] MOTION for Jessica Stebbins Bina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18431581. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint served on Bernie Diamond on 9/19/2019. Service was accepted by Bernie Diamond. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Berman, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court's Memo Endorsement served on Stephanie E. Niehaus, Esq. on December 16, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Berman, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court's Memo Endorsement (Doc. No. 136) served on Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc. and JMBP, LLC on December 16, 2019. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [129] LETTER MOTION for Conference re Proposed Motion to Compel the MGM Entities addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated December 10, 2019. filed by Richard Roe, Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe. ENDORSEMENT: It is ORDERED that non-parties Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios, Inc. and JMBP, LLC shall email a letter response to Plaintiff's letter motion to Schofield_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov by January 6, 2020. Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on non-parties Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios, Inc. and JMBP, LLC and file proof of service on ECF by December 19, 2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/16/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [131] LETTER MOTION for Conference re: PROPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew G. Celli, Jr. dated December 10, 2019. filed by Richard Roe, Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe. ENDORSEMENT: It is ORDERED that non-party ACN Opportunity, LLC shall email a letter response to Plaintiff's letter motion to Schofield_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov by Janaury 6, 2020. Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on non-party ACN Opportunity, LLC and file proof of service on ECF by December 19, 2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/16/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan and Joanna C. Hendon dated December 12, 2019 re: Re Status Update. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated 12/11/2019 re: [131] LETTER MOTION for Conference re: PROPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew G. Celli, Jr. dated December 10, 2019., [129] LETTER MOTION for Conference re Proposed Motion to Compel the MGM Entities addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated December 10, 2019. . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Kincaid, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS' LETTER MOTION [DKT#131] served on ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC on December 10, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Bourland, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019, Terminated: 1/7/2020 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Conference re: PROPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL ACN OPPORTUNITY, LLC addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew G. Celli, Jr. dated December 10, 2019. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Celli, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc. and JMBP, LLC on December 10, 2019. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019, Terminated: 1/23/2020 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Conference re Proposed Motion to Compel the MGM Entities addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated December 10, 2019. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Bourland on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Bourland, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (sjo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from R. Kaplan and J. Hendon dated October 28, 2019 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [77] Amended Complaint,. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Kincaid, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [124] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to remove the email address jmatz@kaplanhecker.com from the ECF service notification list for this case. (Attorney Joshua Adam Matz terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/17/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019, Terminated: 10/17/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Joshua Matz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Kaplan in Support)(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying [122] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED without prejudice to re-filing in compliance with Local Civil Rule 1.4. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/16/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019, Terminated: 10/16/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Joshua Matz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support)(Matz, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [113] MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affirmation of Cynthia Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Kincaid, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [113] MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin White on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (White, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated September 8, 2019 re: Defendants' submissions dated September 6, 2019. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [116] Letter, filed by Richard Roe, Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe. ENDORSEMENT: It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file the letter and three exhibits that were emailed to Chambers on September 8, 2019, in the form in which they were emailed, by September 19, 2019. The parties are reminded to follow the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures, and to communicate via ECF and not via e-mail. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/18/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated September 17, 2019 re: Defendants' Letter Dated 9/17/2019 (ECF No. 115). Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter from R. Kaplan to J. Hendon Dated September 12, 2019)(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated September 17, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' September 8 Letter. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [113] MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019, Terminated: 4/8/2020 Motion to compel arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/10/2019) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [108] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that for the reasons above, and as further articulated in Plaintiffs' opposition letter at Docket No. 109, Defendants motion for reconsideration is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to compel arbitration is amended as follows: Defendants shall file their motion by September 17, 2019; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by September 24, 2019; and Defendants shall file their reply by September 27, 2019. Discovery will proceed in the ordinary course per the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. The proposed Protective Order will be addressed separately. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket No. 108. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/9/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/17/2019. Responses due by 9/24/2019 Replies due by 9/27/2019. (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/8/2019, Entered: 9/8/2019 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from R. Kaplan dated September 8, 2019 re: [108] LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated September 6, 2019. . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019, Terminated: 9/9/2019 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated September 6, 2019. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: As discussed at the conference, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants may file a motion to compel arbitration, which shall be subject to the following schedule: Defendants shall file their motion by September 12, 2019; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by September 19, 2019; and Defendants shall file their reply by September 24, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the discovery stay is lifted. A separate case management plan will follow. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 9/12/2019., Responses due by 9/19/2019, Replies due by 9/24/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/5/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: The Trump Corporation answer due 10/22/2019; Donald J. Trump answer due 10/22/2019; Donald Trump, Jr answer due 10/22/2019; Eric Trump answer due 10/22/2019; Ivanka Trump answer due 10/22/2019. (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 9/5/2019. (jcs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from R. Kaplan dated September 4, 2019 Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from R. Kaplan and J. Hendon dated August 29, 2019 re: Status Conference. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: 8/2/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John C. Quinn dated August 2, 2019 re: Defendants' Letter to the Court Dated August 1, 2019 (ECF No. 101). Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Quinn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [101] Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; granting [101] Letter Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that discovery shall remain stayed pending the September 5, 2019, status conference. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall address all other issues (including Defendants' proposed motions to compel arbitration, to stay discovery pending such motion) in their joint letter due August 29, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 101. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/1/2019) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019, Terminated: 8/1/2019 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated 08/01/2019., LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated 08/01/2019. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Kincaid, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part [99] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part. The status conference scheduled for August 8, 2019, is adjourned to September 5, 2019, at 10:40 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file their joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 98) is extended to August 29, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the deadline to answer the Amended Complaint is extended to September 26, 2019. Status Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/30/2019) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2019. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019, Terminated: 7/30/2019 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for August 8, 2019 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated July 29, 2019. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by August 1, 2019, the parties shall jointly file (1) a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and (2) a joint letter, not to exceed ten pages, setting forth each party's position regarding Defendants' proposed motion to compel arbitration and any other issue the parties would like the Court to address. The letter shall include a joint proposed briefing schedule for the motion to compel arbitration. It is further ORDERED that on August 8, 2019, at 10:40 a.m., a status conference will be held to discuss the parties' joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. (Status Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/25/2019) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot [83] Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot [87] Letter Motion for Conference. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to the RICO claims (Counts I and II), and they are dismissed. Defendants' motion is denied with respect to the state law claims (Counts III through VIII), and they survive. Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Dkt. No. 87) and Defendants' motion for oral argument (Dkt. No. 89) are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket Nos. 83 and 87. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/24/2019) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 96 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated July 19, 2019 re: Anticipated Motion to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 95 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Lawrence Kincaid on behalf of The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Kincaid, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated July 19, 2019 re: Anticipated Motion to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 93 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [92] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Attorney Bradley Philip Pollina terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/9/2019) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019, Terminated: 5/9/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Bradley Pollina to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Pollina, Bradley) Modified on 7/1/2019 (ldi).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 91 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated March 14, 2019 re: Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [83] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 89 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated March 13, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' Letter Motion dated March 7, 2019. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER with respect to [87] LETTER MOTION for Conference and request for Pre-Motion Conference concerning proposed motion to strike. It is ORDERED that Defendants shall file a letter response, not to exceed three pages, by March 13, 2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/8/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/13/2019 (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/13/2019 (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019, Terminated: 7/24/2019 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Conference and request for Pre-Motion Conference concerning proposed motion to strike addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew G. Celli, Jr. dated March 7, 2019. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Brinckerhoff, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 86 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [83] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION of Cynthia Chen in Support re: [83] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10-T)(Chen, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [83] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 83 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019, Terminated: 7/24/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [75] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Attorney David Spears terminated (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/4/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot [63] Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint by February 21, 2019, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by March 7, 2019, and Defendants shall file their reply by March 14, 2019. The parties are limited to thirty pages for their memoranda in support of and in opposition to the motion, and twelve pages for the reply. It is further ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss the Complaint (Dkt. No. 63) is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 63. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/4/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/21/2019. Responses due by 3/7/2019 Replies due by 3/14/2019. (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 80 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of David Spears in Support re: [75] MOTION for David Spears to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated February 1, 2019 re: Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Scheduling Order)(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated January 31, 2019 re: Amended Complaint Redline Comparite. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Comparite Redline)(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 77 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [19] Complaint against The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Richard Roe, Luke Loe, Jane Doe, Mary Moe. Related document: [19] Complaint.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Withdraw Appearance of David Spears on January 28, 2019. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Chen, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019, Terminated: 2/4/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for David Spears to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of David Spears Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4)(Spears, David) Modified on 2/8/2019 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [71] NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER filed by Ivanka Trump, Donald Trump, Jr., The Trump Corporation, Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED without prejudice to renewal. An order granting leave to withdraw as counsel of record "may be granted only upon a showing by affidavit or otherwise of satisfactory reasons for withdrawal or displacement and the posture of the case, including its position, if any, on the calendar, and whether or not the attorney is asserting a retaining or charging lien." Local Rule 1.4. Counsel must also serve his application to withdraw on his clients and all parties. Local Rule 1.4. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/24/2019) (ks) Modified on 1/28/2019 (ks).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 72 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of David Spears re: [71] Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Appearance and Order. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 71 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance and Order. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIRMATION OF CYNTHIA CHEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT re: [63] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. Attached Exhibits (paper format: Exhibits 1A, 1B, 1C, 1T, 2A, 2B, 2C, 2T, 3A, 3B, 3T, Exhibits 4 - 20, 21T). (Disk format: Exhibits 1A, 1B, 2A, 2B, 3A). Affirmation submitted in paper format only. (rjm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 70 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated January 16, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' Letter dated January 16, 2019. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated January 16, 2019 re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Submission. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIRMATION of Cynthia Chen in Support re: [63] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1A, # (2) Exhibit 1B, # (3) Exhibit 1C, # (4) Exhibit 1-T, # (5) Exhibit 2A, # (6) Exhibit 2B, # (7) Exhibit 2C, # (8) Exhibit 2-T, # (9) Exhibit 3A, # (10) Exhibit 3B, # (11) Exhibit 3-T, # (12) Exhibit 4, # (13) Exhibit 5, # (14) Exhibit 6, # (15) Exhibit 7, # (16) Exhibit 8, # (17) Exhibit 9, # (18) Exhibit 10, # (19) Exhibit 11, # (20) Exhibit 12, # (21) Exhibit 13, # (22) Exhibit 14, # (23) Exhibit 15, # (24) Exhibit 16, # (25) Exhibit 17, # (26) Exhibit 18, # (27) Exhibit 19, # (28) Exhibit 20, # (29) Exhibit 21-T)(Chen, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part [62] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application GRANTED in part. Defendants shall submit hard copies of Ms. Chen's affirmation and exhibits with the Court and shall serve the hard copies on Plaintiffs. The parties are permitted to file more than 15 exhibits and may exceed the exhibit page limit, provided the total number of pages does not exceed 225. Defendants shall refile Ms. Chen's affirmation and attached exhibits by January 18, 2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/15/2019) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIRMATION of Cynthia Chen in Support re: [63] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1A, # (2) Exhibit 1B, # (3) Exhibit 1C, # (4) Exhibit 1-T, # (5) Exhibit 2A, # (6) Exhibit 2B, # (7) Exhibit 2C, # (8) Exhibit 2-T, # (9) Exhibit 3A, # (10) Exhibit 3B, # (11) Exhibit 3-T, # (12) Exhibit 4, # (13) Exhibit 5, # (14) Exhibit 6, # (15) Exhibit 7, # (16) Exhibit 8, # (17) Exhibit 9, # (18) Exhibit 10, # (19) Exhibit 11, # (20) Exhibit 12, # (21) Exhibit 13, # (22) Exhibit 14, # (23) Exhibit 15, # (24) Exhibit 16, # (25) Exhibit 17, # (26) Exhibit 18, # (27) Exhibit 19, # (28) Exhibit 20, # (29) Exhibit 21-T)(Chen, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [63] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. (Corrected). Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE [65] Memorandum) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [63] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Hendon, Joanna) Modified on 1/16/2019 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019, Terminated: 2/4/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019, Terminated: 1/15/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Leave to File Documents in Hard Copy addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joanna C. Hendon dated January 14, 2019. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Calne Hendon on behalf of The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Hendon, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/20/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENECE held on 12/20/2018 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/25/2018, Entered: 12/25/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Carrie Cole on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Cole, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated 12/21/2018 re: in Response to Pre-Motion Letter (ECF No. 49) from D. Spears for proposed motion to dismiss. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: For the reasons stated in the conference, it is hereby further ORDERED that, notwithstanding the stay of discovery, the parties are permitted to serve subpoenas on non-parties for the purpose of document preservation. Plaintiffs are permitted to serve a non-party subpoena on ACN Opportunity, LLC forthwith, and the parties shall meet and confer with respect to other recipients of such non-party subpoenas and bring disputes, if any, to the Court. Pending resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss, any non-party subpoena shall not set a date for the production of responsive documents. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/21/2018) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Quinn, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. [55] Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. [55] Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [50] Letter Motion for Conference; granting [3] Motion. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to proceed under pseudonyms is GRANTED until a decision on the motion to dismiss and may be renewed at that time. It is further ORDERED that by December 21, 2018, at 2:00 p.m., the parties shall file their proposed order regarding third-party document subpoenas. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by January 14, 2019, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by February 22, 2019, and Defendants shall file their reply by March 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that discovery in this matter is stayed pending resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/20/2018) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/14/2019. Responses due by 2/22/2019 Replies due by 3/8/2019. (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/20/2018. (jcs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated December 14, 2018 re: [50] LETTER MOTION for Conference request for pre-motion conference for proposed motion to stay discovery addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David Spears dated 12/10/18. . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [3] MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms . . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [50] LETTER MOTION for Conference request for pre-motion conference for proposed motion to stay discovery addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David Spears dated 12/10/18. filed by Ivanka Trump, Donald Trump, Jr., The Trump Corporation, Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump. ENDORSEMENT: It is ORDERED that by December 14, 2018, Plaintiffs shall file a responsive letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A.1. The proposed motion to stay discovery will be discussed at the initial pretrial conference, which is hereby adjourned from December 13, 2018, to December 20, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. (Responses due by 12/14/2018, Initial Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/10/2018) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018, Terminated: 12/20/2018 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Conference request for pre-motion conference for proposed motion to stay discovery addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David Spears dated 12/10/18. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David Spears dated 12/10/18 re: pre-motion letter for proposed motion to dismiss. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from R. Kaplan and D. Spears dated 12/6/2018 re: Joint Pre-Initial Conference Letter and Case Management Plan. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Cynthia Chen in Opposition re: [3] MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms .. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Chen, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [3] MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms . . Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [43] Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting [43] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The Trump Corporation answer due 12/10/2018; Donald J. Trump answer due 12/10/2018; Donald Trump, Jr answer due 12/10/2018; Eric Trump answer due 12/10/2018; Ivanka Trump answer due 12/10/2018 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/14/2018) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Benjamin Berman on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Berman, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/30/2018 Replies due by 12/14/2018. (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018, Terminated: 11/14/2018 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit remaining briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David Spears dated November 9, 2018., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David Spears dated November 9, 2018. Document filed by The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump.(Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/8/2018) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Trump Corporation.(Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia Chen on behalf of The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Chen, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Philip Pollina on behalf of The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Pollina, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Spears on behalf of The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. (Spears, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Court's October 30th, 2018 Order (ECF No. 30) served on The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump Jr., Eric Trump, and Ivanka Trump on 10/31/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms served on The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump Jr., Eric Trump, and Ivanka Trump on 10/30/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ivanka Trump served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service was accepted by Nicholas Hansen, Security Officer. Document filed by Richard Roe; Luke Loe; Jane Doe; Mary Moe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Eric Trump served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service was accepted by Nicholas Hansen, Security Officer. Document filed by Richard Roe; Luke Loe; Jane Doe; Mary Moe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Donald Trump, Jr served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service was accepted by Nicholas Hansen, Security Officer. Document filed by Richard Roe; Luke Loe; Jane Doe; Mary Moe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Donald J. Trump served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service was accepted by Nicholas Hansen, Security Officer. Document filed by Richard Roe; Luke Loe; Jane Doe; Mary Moe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Trump Corporation served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service was accepted by Nicholas Hansen, Security Officer. Document filed by Richard Roe; Luke Loe; Jane Doe; Mary Moe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: WHEREAS, Plaintiffs have moved to proceed under pseudonyms in this action (Dkt. No. 3). It is hereby ORDERED that the pre-motion conference (pursuant to Individual Rule III.A.1) is waived. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs motion, if any, by November 13, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply by November 20, 2018. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [3] MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms: Responses due by 11/13/2018, Replies due by 11/20/2018.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/30/2018) (ne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Trump Corporation. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ivanka Trump. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric Trump. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald Trump, Jr. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ivanka Trump, re: [19] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta) Modified on 10/30/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric Trump, re: [19] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta) Modified on 10/30/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald Trump Jr., re: [19] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta) Modified on 10/30/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, re: [19] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta) Modified on 10/30/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Trump Corporation, re: [19] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta) Modified on 10/30/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against The Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump. Document filed by Richard Roe, Luke Loe, Jane Doe, Mary Moe.(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Roberta Ann Kaplan to RE-FILE Document No. [13] Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason: a summons can only be requested/issued for a named defendant. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Roberta Ann Kaplan to RE-FILE Document No. [1] Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ivanka Trump, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric Trump, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald Trump Jr., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Trump Corporation, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING (SEE [14] Request for Issuance of Summons) - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Donald J. Trump Corporation, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta) Modified on 10/30/2018 (pne). Modified on 10/30/2018 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Wilson, Ogilvie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew D. Brinckerhoff on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Brinckerhoff, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine R. Rosenfeld on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew G. Celli on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Celli, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew J. Craig on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Craig, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander J Rodney on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Rodney, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Adam Matz on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Matz, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Charles Quinn on behalf of Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Quinn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [3] MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms . . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018, Terminated: 12/20/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms . Document filed by Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kaplan, Roberta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15822412)Document filed by Richard Roe, Luke Loe, Jane Doe, Mary Moe.(Kaplan, Roberta) Modified on 10/30/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 498 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?