T. Trainer v. Red Hat, Inc., et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2014-1-CV-273025

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 29, 2018 at 2:57 PM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Trainer, Thomas, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Rangashari, Rangu, Defendant
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant
Case Type Wrongful Termination Unlimited (36)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service
CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/15/2015
    Blank 5 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Notice: Removal to Federal Court
    Atty Fiss; Legacy Name = CV Ntc to Adv Pty: Removal to Federal Ct; Decision = M; Closed = 01/15/2015
      Blank 4 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
      CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 12/24/2014
        Blank 3 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
        CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 11/10/2014
          Blank 2 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
          Atty: Imad Y. Elias, (323) 857-9500; Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 11/10/2014
            Blank 1 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
            CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 11/10/2014

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?