Hoffmann v. Oliveros
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-06577

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 5, 2021 at 4:58 PM DT (1.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kasey F Hoffmann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by K-36451

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kasey F Hoffmann
v.
No Logo E Oliveros, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of State Hospitals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Hay-Mie Cho +1 415 510 4433 haymie.cho@doj.ca.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PSP
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PSP
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Summary Judgment PSP
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document PSP
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document PSP
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Dismiss PSP
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Produce
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Produce PSP
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document PSP
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Order of Service
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Received Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document PSP
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Request
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief PSP
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge James Donato granting 14 Motion to screen complaint; granting 2 Motion to screen complaint. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION Defendant's Request for Screening Order filed by E Oliveros. Responses due by 1/2/2019. Replies due by 1/16/2019. (Cho, C. Hay-Mie) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by E Oliveros. (Cho, C. Hay-Mie) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a United States District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 Notice of intent to Amend Complaint filed by Kasey F Hoffmann. (Related document(s) 9 ) (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Intent to Amend Complaint by Kasey F Hoffmann (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by E Oliveros.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Cho, C. Hay-Mie) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E Oliveros re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, Proof of Service Regarding Courts Order Dated October 29, 2018 (Cho, C. Hay-Mie) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by E Oliveros re 1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Compliance With Requirement to Give Notice of Removal (Cho, C. Hay-Mie) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by E Oliveros. (Cho, C. Hay-Mie) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION Defendants Request for Screening Order filed by E Oliveros. Responses due by 11/26/2018. Replies due by 12/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Request for Screening)(Cho, C. Hay-Mie) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. ??1441(A) (Federal Question) from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CV002576. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12801271). Filed by E Oliveros. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, State Court Docket Sheet to D - USCD Civil Local Rules pages 14-93 to Notice of Removal, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cho, C. Hay-Mie) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?