District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  1. Case No. 17-1722
    Filed 5/31/2017
  2. Case No. 16-3945
    Filed 11/23/2016
  3. Case No. 18-2868
    Filed 9/28/2018
  4. Case No. 17-1625
    Filed 5/19/2017
United States Supreme Court

Giuffre v. Maxwell
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-3945

Tags
Last Updated October 29, 2018 at 11:08 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 12/06/2018, SET.[2413612] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 10/18/2018 04:43 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 12/03/2018, PROPOSED.[2398860] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/27/2018 05:16 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ATTORNEY, Marc Randazza for Michael Cernovich[204], ADDED.[2382931] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/06/2018 08:39 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/05/2018 by CM/ECF. [2382858] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/05/2018 05:16 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 09/05/2018, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, RECEIVED. Service date 09/05/2018 by CM/ECF.[2382523] [16-3945] [Entered: 09/05/2018 02:35 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2368050] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/15/2018 08:54 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, informing Court that he takes no position on whether oral argument should be held, but would like to participate if oral argument is held, RECEIVED. Service date 06/08/2018 by CM/ECF.[2321486] [16-3945] [Entered: 06/08/2018 03:48 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 04/12/2018, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, RECEIVED. Service date 04/12/2018 by CM/ECF.[2277947] [16-3945] [Entered: 04/12/2018 02:10 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 04/10/2018, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, RECEIVED. Service date 04/10/2018 by CM/ECF.[2275785] [16-3945] [Entered: 04/10/2018 01:29 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF, email.[2270011] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 04/02/2018 05:19 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF.[2269963] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 04/02/2018 04:52 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF.[2269670] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 04/02/2018 02:26 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER, dated 03/02/2018, instructing parties to file supplemental briefs regarding the question of appellate jurisdiction in this case; the supplemental briefs must be submitted by 04/02/2018, FILED.[2248556] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 03/02/2018 03:17 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. [2247604] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 03/01/2018 04:28 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Certificate of Service of Confidential Appellee Brief (Sealed per DE 178-179], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 02/22/2018 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2241786] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 02/22/2018 04:34 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 02/20/2018, to SDNY (New York City), ISSUED.[2239144] [16-3945] [Entered: 02/20/2018 01:27 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal Appellee's brief; to the extent that they have not yet done so, the parties are also hereby instructed to brief for the merits panel the question of appellate jurisdiction [127] filed by Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, by ALK, DAL, MEYER, D.J., FILED. [2239140][178] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 02/20/2018 01:25 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2230392] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 02/06/2018 03:17 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CURED DEFECTIVE Letter [164], [165], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, FILED.[2209221] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/09/2018 12:08 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, informing Court that it takes no position on whether oral argument should be held, but would like to participate if oral argument is held, RECEIVED. Service date 01/09/2018 by CM/ECF.[2209195] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/09/2018 12:01 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [163], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, FILED.[2208742] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/09/2018 08:47 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Paul Cassell, Esq. for Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 01/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2208161] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 01/08/2018 01:47 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?